Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3020394 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3020394



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 128
22.12.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
15.09.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
08.06.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
01.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.06.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.02.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
02.02.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.01.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
10.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.11.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
10.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
10.11.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
10.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
23.05.2016 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
20.04.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
02.03.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
18.02.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.02.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 6
18.02.2016 European search report Search / examination 7
18.02.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
10.02.2016 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.02.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
14.01.2016 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 10
22.12.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
22.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
22.12.2015 Description Search / examination 23
22.12.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
22.12.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
22.12.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4
20.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 29