Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3040923

EP3040923 - PAYMENT SERVICE SYSTEM USING BEACON, AND PAYMENT SERVICE DEVICE AND METHOD IN THE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.10.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SK Planet Co., Ltd.
(Sampyeong-dong)
264, Pangyo-ro, Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si
Gyeonggi-do 463-400 / KR
[2016/27]
Inventor(s)01 / KWAK, Sebyung
22, Dolgoji-ro 14-gil
Seongbuk-gu
02785 Seoul / KR
 [2016/27]
Representative(s)Novagraaf Technologies
Bâtiment O2
2, rue Sarah Bernhardt
CS90017
92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/27]Thorniley, Peter , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date15202129.122.12.2015
[2016/27]
Priority number, dateKR2015000006202.01.2015         Original published format: KR 20150000062
[2016/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3040923
Date:06.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06Q20/32, G06Q30/02, G06Q30/06, H04W4/00
[2016/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/08]
Former [2016/27]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZAHLUNGSSERVICESYSTEM MITTELS BAKE SOWIE ZAHLUNGSSERVICEVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN IN DEM SYSTEM[2016/27]
English:PAYMENT SERVICE SYSTEM USING BEACON, AND PAYMENT SERVICE DEVICE AND METHOD IN THE SYSTEM[2016/27]
French:SYSTÈME DE SERVICE DE PAIEMENT UTILISANT UNE BALISE ET DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE SERVICE DE PAIEMENT DANS LE SYSTÈME[2016/27]
Examination procedure22.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/27]
11.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
08.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
11.01.2017Request for further processing filed
11.01.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.02.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[I]WO02099758  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [I] 1-14 * page 2, line 4 - page 4, line 21 * * page 5, line 4 - page 8, line 10; figures 1,2; claims 1-18 *;
 [I]WO2013163326  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0081]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0131]; figures 9-13 * * paragraph [0370] - paragraph [0392]; figures 28-30 * * paragraph [0402] - paragraph [0432]; figures 31-32 *;
 [I]US2013065584  (LYON JAMES M [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0052] *;
 [I]US2014114780  (MENEFEE MICHAEL [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0051]; figure -; claim - *;
 [I]US2010061294  (PROCTOR JR JAMES ARTHUR [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * page 1, paragraph 10 - page 2, paragraph 20 * * page 4, paragraph 46 - page 6, paragraph 60 * * page 6, paragraph 63 - page 8, paragraph 73 * * page 9, paragraph 83 - page 11, paragraph 153; figures 2,6-11 *;
 [XP]WO2015156960  (EBAY INC [US]) [XP] 1-14 * the whole document *