Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3184047

EP3184047 - PHANTOM FOR RADIATION DOSIMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.06.2018
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.07.2018  [2018/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ION BEAM APPLICATIONS S.A.
Chemin du Cyclotron, 3
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
[2017/26]
Inventor(s)01 / MENICHELLI, David
Centrum 10c
92353 Postbauer-Heng / DE
 [2017/26]
Representative(s)Pecher, Nicolas , et al
Pecher & Partners
Rue Louis de Geer, 6
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
[2017/26]
Application number, filing date15202478.223.12.2015
[2017/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3184047
Date:28.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B6/00, A61N5/10
[2017/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/26]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PHANTOM FÜR STRAHLUNGSDOSIMETRIE[2017/26]
English:PHANTOM FOR RADIATION DOSIMETRY[2017/26]
French:FANTÔME DE DOSIMÉTRIE PAR RAYONNEMENTS[2017/26]
Examination procedure03.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/27]
15.02.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/27]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201703   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2003231740  (PALIWAL BHUDATT R [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9,10 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0054]; figure - * [A] 6-8,11,14 [I] 12,13,15,16;
 [XAI]US2013006035  (AITKENHEAD ADAM H [GB], et al) [X] 1,5,6,9 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0098]; figure - * [A] 2,4,7,8,10,11,14,16 [I] 3,12,13,15
 [XA]  - PALIWAL BHUDATT ET AL, "A spiral phantom for IMRT and tomotherapy treatment delivery verification", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20001101), vol. 27, no. 11, doi:10.1118/1.1319523, ISSN 0094-2405, pages 2503 - 2507, XP012011000 [X] 1-5,9,12,13 * the whole document * [A] 6-8,11,14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.1319523
by applicantUS2015041632
    - LEWIS ET AL., MED. PHYS., (2012), vol. 39, page 6339,