Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3045649

EP3045649 - GLAZING REBATE INSERT ELEMENT FOR A WINDOW OR A DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.05.2018
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCHÜCO International KG
Karolinenstrasse 1 - 15
33609 Bielefeld / DE
[2016/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Schiller, Mathias
Industriestrasse 25
33790 Halle / DE
 [2016/29]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/26]
Former [2016/29]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date15202964.129.12.2015
[2016/29]
Priority number, dateDE20152000195U16.01.2015         Original published format: DE 202015000195 U
[2016/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3045649
Date:20.07.2016
Language:DE
[2016/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3045649
Date:28.06.2017
Language:DE
[2017/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:E06B3/54, E06B3/263, E06B3/58, // E06B3/70, E06B7/23
[2016/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/41]
Former [2016/29]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:FALZEINLAGEELEMENT FÜR EIN FENSTER ODER EINE TÜR[2016/29]
English:GLAZING REBATE INSERT ELEMENT FOR A WINDOW OR A DOOR[2016/29]
French:ÉLEMENT DE FEUILLURE DE FENETRE OU DE PORTE[2017/04]
Former [2016/29]ÉLÉMENT DE FEUILLURE DE FENÊTRE OU DE PORTE
Examination procedure01.09.2016Examination requested  [2016/41]
16.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.05.2017Fee for grant paid
12.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)29.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.12.2015
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
MT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
IE29.12.2017
LU29.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
[2019/31]
Former [2019/30]CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
MT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
IE29.12.2017
LU29.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
Former [2018/49]CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
IE29.12.2017
LU29.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
Former [2018/45]CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
IE29.12.2017
LU29.12.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
LU29.12.2017
Former [2018/40]CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/21]CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/11]CZ28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/10]CZ28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/52]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/50]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/49]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]DE202009009251U  (GRUNDMEIER KG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0004] - [0005] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0018] *;
 [A]DE202008005170U  (DEFLEX DICHTSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] *;
 [AD]EP0745749  (NIEMANN HANS DIETER [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * figure 2 *
by applicantEP0745749