Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3046073

EP3046073 - Method and apparatus for color correction in an alpha matting process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  27.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.08.2017  [2017/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2016/29]
Inventor(s)01 / Hoerentrup, Jobst
Neustadtstr. 4
30974 Wennigsen / DE
02 / Schlosser, Markus
Hirschstr. 108
76137 Karlsruhe / DE
 [2016/29]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne , et al
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/29]Huchet, Anne , et al
Technicolor
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Application number, filing date15305025.714.01.2015
[2016/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3046073
Date:20.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06T5/20, G06T5/50, G06T7/00
[2016/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/29]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Farbkorrektur in einem Alpha-Mattierungsverfahren[2016/29]
English:Method and apparatus for color correction in an alpha matting process[2016/29]
French:Procédé et appareil pour la correction des couleurs dans un processus de matage alpha[2016/29]
Examination procedure21.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/32]
28.02.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/32]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201703   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XDY]  - HORENTRUP ET AL., "Confidence-aware Guided Image Filter", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP, (2014), XP055192222 [XD] 1-7,9-11 * abstract * * page 3243, column r, line 16 - page 3246, column r, line 5 * * figure 1 * [Y] 8

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2014.7025656
 [YD]  - A. LEVIN ET AL., "A Closed-Form Solution to Natural Image Matting", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (2008), vol. 30, pages 228 - 242, XP011246442 [YD] 8 * abstract * * page 230, column r, line 1 - page 231, column r, line 26 *
 [XD]  - K. HE ET AL., "Guided Image Filtering", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (2013), vol. 35, pages 1397 - 1409, XP055127406 [XD] 1,9-11 * abstract * * page 1397, column l, line 1 - page 1398, column l, line 19 * * page 1402, column r, line 37 - page 1403, column r, line l * * page 1407, column l, line 1 - line 17 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.2012.213
 [AD]  - K. HE ET AL., "A Global Sampling Method for Alpha Matting", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2011 IEEE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION (CVPR'LL, (2011), pages 2049 - 2056, XP032037997 [AD] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2011.5995495
by applicant   - C. RHEMANN ET AL., ALPHA MATTING BENCHMARK, URL: www.alphamatting.com
    - A. LEVIN ET AL., "A Closed-Form Solution to Natural Image Matting", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (2008), vol. 30, pages 228 - 242
    - KOHLER ET AL., "Improving Alpha Matting and Motion Blurred Foreground Estimation", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2013 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP, pages 3446 - 3450
    - K. HE ET AL., "Guided Image Filtering", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (2013), vol. 35, pages 1397 - 1409
    - C. RHEMANN ET AL., "A Perceptually Motivated Online Benchmark For Image Matting", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2009 IEEE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION (CVPR'09, (2009), pages 1826 - 1833
    - K. HE ET AL., "A Global Sampling Method for Alpha Matting", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2011 IEEE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION (CVPR'LL, (2011), pages 2049 - 2056
 EP20140306979