Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3046073


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.07.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
08.03.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
27.02.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
17.06.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  20.07.2016  [2016/29]
28.04.2016 Change - representative
30.01.2015 Change - representative