Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3070942

EP3070942 - Method and apparatus for displaying light field video data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
InterDigital CE Patent Holdings
3 rue du Colonel Moll
75017 Paris / FR
[2019/19]
Former [2016/38]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Sabater, Neus
10B Allée de Lanvaux
35700 Rennes / FR
02 / Le Clerc, Francois
5, rue Alain Gerbault
35590 L'Hermitage / FR
03 / Schmouker, Philippe
11 rue Jacques Cassard
35830 Betton / FR
 [2016/38]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne , et al
InterDigital CE Patent Holdings
20, rue Rouget de Lisle
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/38]Huchet, Anne , et al
Technicolor
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Application number, filing date15305390.517.03.2015
[2016/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3070942
Date:21.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04N13/00, H04N21/472, H04N5/232, H04N21/431
[2016/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/17]
Former [2016/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANZEIGE VON LICHTFELD-VIDEODATEN[2016/38]
English:Method and apparatus for displaying light field video data[2016/38]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'AFFICHER DES DONNÉES VIDÉO DE CHAMP LUMINEUX[2016/38]
Examination procedure17.03.2015Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/17]
18.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2006028473  (UYTTENDAELE MATTHEW T [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11,13,16 * paragraphs [0019] - [0022] - [0037] , [0064] * [Y] 3,10 [I] 4-9,12,14,15;
 [XI]US2014092281  (NISENZON SEMYON [US], et al) [X] 1,11,16 * paragraphs [0045] , [0063] - [0065] * [I] 4-9,12,14,15;
 [Y]US2015029379  (KIM JAE-GON [KR], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0056] - [0057] *;
 [Y]US2014300646  (PITTS COLVIN [US], et al) [Y] 10 * paragraphs [0193] - [0194] *
by applicant   - LIGHTFIELD FORUM, URL: http://nb.dropmark.com/89973/1342251
    - A. W. M. SMEULDERS, "Visual Tracking: An Experimental Survey", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (2014), vol. 6, no. 7