Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3070942 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3070942



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 489
26.11.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.11.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.09.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
02.09.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
02.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.09.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 35
02.09.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
15.07.2019 Document concerning representation Search / examination 71
09.05.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
09.05.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.04.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
26.03.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 234
26.03.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 2
26.03.2019 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 13
21.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.01.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
21.01.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
21.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.01.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
15.11.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.11.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
08.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.11.2018 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.10.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.08.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.08.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
24.08.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
23.08.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
18.07.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
18.07.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.07.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
21.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.03.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
21.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
21.03.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
21.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
26.09.2016 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
20.09.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
16.09.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
24.08.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
10.05.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
10.05.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
09.05.2016 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
02.05.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.04.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 4
28.09.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.09.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
28.09.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
11.09.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
30.03.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt from National Office - R35(4) Search / examination 2
17.03.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
17.03.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
17.03.2015 Claims Search / examination 5
17.03.2015 Description Search / examination 23
17.03.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.03.2015 Drawings Search / examination 4
17.03.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5