Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3070942


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.11.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.09.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
06.05.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.04.2019 Change - applicant published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
26.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.01.2019 New entry: Reply to examination report
09.11.2018 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.08.2018 Change - representative
27.07.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.07.2018 First examination report
30.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.03.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
24.03.2017 Request for examination filed published on  26.04.2017  [2017/17]
24.03.2017 Change - designated states published on  26.04.2017  [2017/17]
22.03.2017 Amendment by applicant
19.08.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  21.09.2016  [2016/38]
28.04.2016 Change - representative
26.03.2015 Change - representative