Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3088954

EP3088954 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PROCESSING A LIGHTFIELD CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.11.2017  [2017/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2016/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Vandame, Benoit
TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE
975 AVENUE DES CHAMPS BLANCS
35576 CESSON SEVIGNE CEDEX / FR
02 / Sabater, Neus
TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE
975 AVENUE DES CHAMPS BLANCS
35576 CESSON SEVIGNE CEDEX / FR
03 / Bureller, Olivier
TECHNICOLOR R&D FRANCE
975 AVENUE DES CHAMPS BLANCS
35576 CESSON SEVIGNE CEDEX / FR
 [2016/44]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2016/44]
Application number, filing date15305645.227.04.2015
[2016/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3088954
Date:02.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:G03B35/10, H01L27/146, H04N5/232, H04N13/02
[2016/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINES LICHTFELDINHALTS[2016/44]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PROCESSING A LIGHTFIELD CONTENT[2016/44]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'UN CONTENU DE CHAMP DE LUMIÈRE[2016/44]
Examination procedure03.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/44]
09.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/44]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201703   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US8749620  (KNIGHT TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,8,10-12,15 * column 3, lines 4-22; figure 9H * * column 14, lines 11-26,32-37,45-64 * * column 26, lines 45-64 * * column 25, paragraph last - column 26, paragraph 1 * [Y] 2,6,7,9,13,14;
 [X]US8811769  (PITTS COLVIN [US], et al) [X] 1,8 * claims 6,7 *;
 [Y]EP2475162  (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 2,6,7,9,13,14 * paragraph [0044] *;
 [A]US2014225991  (LIN CHUN-TA [TW], et al) [A] 1,8 * paragraph [0009] *
by applicantJP2013105151