Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2997809

EP2997809 - DEVICE FOR COUPLING A FLAIL KNIFE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.08.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Scopagreen
3 Zone Artisanale Voie Romaine
88630 Soulosse Sous Saint-Elophe / FR
[2016/12]
Inventor(s)01 / Gaudé, Simon
95 bis allée de l'An 2000
88300 MONT LES NEUFCHATEAU / FR
 [2016/12]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
2 allée de la Forêt de la Reine
54500 Vandoeuvre-lès-Nancy / FR
[2017/47]
Former [2016/12]Rhein, Alain
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
L'Escurial - Technopole Nancy Brabois
17 avenue de la Forêt de Haye
54500 Vandoeuvre-les-Nancy / FR
Application number, filing date15306459.718.09.2015
[2016/12]
Priority number, dateFR2014005887819.09.2014         Original published format: FR 1458878
[2016/12]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2997809
Date:23.03.2016
Language:FR
[2016/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2997809
Date:22.11.2017
Language:FR
[2017/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:A01D34/535
[2016/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/41]
Former [2016/12]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:AUFHÄNGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN DRESCHFLEGEL[2016/12]
English:DEVICE FOR COUPLING A FLAIL KNIFE[2016/12]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ACCROCHAGE D'UN FLÉAU[2016/12]
Examination procedure06.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.09.2016Examination requested  [2016/41]
08.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.04.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
21.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.10.2017Fee for grant paid
13.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)23.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
IT22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MC22.11.2017
MT22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2018/52]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
IT22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MT22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SI22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/43]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
IT22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
MT22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
IT22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RO22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
IT22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
PL22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
SM22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT22.11.2017
CY22.11.2017
CZ22.11.2017
DK22.11.2017
EE22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
SK22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
LV22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
BG22.02.2018
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT22.11.2017
ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
HR22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
RS22.11.2017
SE22.11.2017
NO22.02.2018
GR23.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES22.11.2017
FI22.11.2017
LT22.11.2017
NL22.11.2017
NO22.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]DE8704846U  (AMAZONE-WERKE) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3831359  (MATHEWS B) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
by applicantDE19607350
 FR1422000