Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3185566

EP3185566 - METHOD FOR PLAYING BACK A PLURALITY OF MEDIA TITLES, ADAPTED MEDIA SOURCE DEVICE, MEDIA PLAYER DEVICE, MEDIA DELEGATION DEVICE AND CONFIGURABLE AND ADAPTED COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.06.2018  [2018/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2017/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Weber, Michael
Zikadenweg 9
30559 Hannover / DE
02 / Glaeser, Frank
Allerweg 4
30449 Hannover / DE
03 / Jachalsky, Joern
Landwehr 8
30974 Wennigsen / DE
 [2017/26]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne , et al
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2017/26]
Application number, filing date15307107.122.12.2015
[2017/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3185566
Date:28.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/262, H04N21/2187, H04N21/482, H04N21/442, H04N21/472, H04N21/47, H04N21/45
[2017/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/26]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ABSPIELEN MEHRERER MEDIENTITEL, ANGEPASSTE MEDIENQUELLENVORRICHTUNG, MEDIENABSPIELVORRICHTUNG, MEDIENDELEGATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND KONFIGURIERBARES UND ANGEPASSTES COMPUTERPROGRAMM[2017/26]
English:METHOD FOR PLAYING BACK A PLURALITY OF MEDIA TITLES, ADAPTED MEDIA SOURCE DEVICE, MEDIA PLAYER DEVICE, MEDIA DELEGATION DEVICE AND CONFIGURABLE AND ADAPTED COMPUTER PROGRAM[2017/26]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE LECTURE D'UNE PLURALITÉ DE TITRES MULTIMÉDIA, DISPOSITIF DE SOURCE DE MÉDIA ADAPTÉ, DISPOSITIF DE LECTEUR MULTIMÉDIA, DISPOSITIF DE DÉLÉGATION DE MÉDIA ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE CONFIGURABLE ET ADAPTÉ[2017/26]
Examination procedure03.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/26]
05.02.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/26]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201703   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2012112986  (MCCOY CHARLES [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9,12 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 5] , [0 20] - [0023] - [0 38] , [0 52] , [0 53] , [0 64] * [A] 7,8,10,11;
 [A]US2014215544  (ROSSETTI LEONARDO [IE]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0036] - [0037] *;
 [A]US2014140506  (SAREMI THOMAS JEFFERSON [CA], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0048] *;
 [A]WO2011123797  (NETFLIX INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0054] - [55. 59] *