Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3091164

EP3091164 - REINFORCED DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  04.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.12.2017  [2017/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VEGA S.r.l.
Corso Italia, 644
44043 Mirabello (Prov. of Ferrara) / IT
[2016/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Malaguti, Fabrizio
Via A. Palladio, 12
44047 Sant'Agostino FE / IT
02 / Govoni, Fausto
Viale A. Gramsci, 6/B
44047 Sant'Agostino FE / IT
 [2016/45]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[2016/45]
Application number, filing date15425032.804.05.2015
[2016/45]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3091164
Date:09.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:E06B1/12, E06B1/52, E06B3/70, E06B3/82, E06B5/11
[2016/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/45]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERSTÄRKTE TÜR[2016/45]
English:REINFORCED DOOR[2016/45]
French:PORTE RENFORCÉE[2016/45]
Examination procedure10.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/49]
03.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/49]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201703   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR2701286  (DECAYEUX ETS [FR]) [Y] 1-12 * figures 2-3 *;
 [Y]DE4408346  (RIEXINGER TUERENWERK [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3273297  (WEHE JR HERBERT W) [A] 1,9,11,12 * figures 1-2 * * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 65 *;
 [A]DE2422680  (GRESCHBACH STAHLBAU) [A] 9,10 * figures 1-3 *