Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3133062

EP3133062 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF A PHARMACEUTICAL AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.03.2018  [2018/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zaklady Farmaceutyczne Polpharma SA
Ul. Pelplinska 19
83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL
[2017/08]
Inventor(s)01 / KOSIK, Kamil
ul. Królowej Bony 10/9
11-400 Ketrzyn / PL
02 / SAGOL, Karol
ul. Sportowa 1/3
83-110 Tczew / PL
03 / GODZISZ, Mateusz
ul. Rubinowa 16
59-900 Zgorzelec / PL
 [2017/08]
Representative(s)Obrycki, Pawel Andrzej
Pharmaceutical Works Polpharma SA
Ul. Pelplinska 19
83-200 Starogard Gdanski / PL
[2017/08]
Application number, filing date15460045.619.08.2015
[2017/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3133062
Date:22.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:C07D219/06, C07D405/04, C07D239/60, C07C15/00, C07F9/24
[2017/08]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/08]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PHARMAZEUTISCHEN WIRKSTOFFS[2017/08]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF A PHARMACEUTICAL AGENT[2017/08]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN AGENT PHARMACEUTIQUE[2017/08]
Examination procedure23.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/10]
02.10.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/10]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201703   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]  - BRUCE S. ROSS ET AL, "Synthesis of Diastereomerically Pure Nucleotide Phosphoramidates", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (20111021), vol. 76, no. 20, doi:10.1021/jo201492m, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 8311 - 8319, XP055137289 [A] 1-14 * Scheme 3 and Table 1 on p. 8313 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo201492m
by applicantEP2203462
 WO2010135569