Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3070078 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 182
11.05.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
11.05.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
11.05.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
11.05.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
11.05.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 32
05.04.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
21.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.03.2017 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 3
07.12.2016 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
26.09.2016 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
24.08.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
11.09.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
08.09.2015 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
11.08.2015 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
18.06.2015 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
20.05.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.05.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 2
20.05.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
04.05.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
17.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.04.2015 Abstract Search / examination 1
17.04.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
17.04.2015 Description Search / examination 28
17.04.2015 Drawings Search / examination 1
17.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.04.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
26.03.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt from National Office - R35(4) Search / examination 3
20.03.2015 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
20.03.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.03.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.03.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.03.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.03.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.03.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.03.2015 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.03.2015 Drawings Search / examination 1
20.03.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
20.03.2015 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4
20.03.2015 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 34