Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3092873

EP3092873 - OPERATING DEVICE AND COMMUNICATIONS ADAPTER FOR OUTDOOR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.05.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tridonic GmbH & Co. KG
Färbergasse 15
6851 Dornbirn / AT
[2016/46]
Inventor(s)01 / WITTMANN, Gerhard
Kleiberweg 3A
81249 München / DE
 [2016/46]
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2016/46]
Application number, filing date15700099.307.01.2015
[2016/46]
WO2015EP50144
Priority number, dateDE20141020029710.01.2014         Original published format: DE102014200297
[2016/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015104279
Date:16.07.2015
Language:DE
[2015/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3092873
Date:16.11.2016
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2015
[2016/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H05B33/08, H05B37/02
[2016/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/46]
TitleGerman:BETRIEBSGERÄT UND KOMMUNIKATIONSADAPTER FÜR DEN AUßENEINSATZ[2016/46]
English:OPERATING DEVICE AND COMMUNICATIONS ADAPTER FOR OUTDOOR USE[2016/46]
French:ÉQUIPEMENT ET ADAPTATEUR DE COMMUNICATION POUR L'UTILISATION EXTERNE[2016/46]
Entry into regional phase16.06.2016National basic fee paid 
16.06.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
16.06.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/46]
28.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2012038281  (VERFUERTH NEAL R [US]) [X] 1,14,15 * paragraphs [0022] , [0026] , [0030] , [0031] , [3240] , [0042] , [0045] , [0083]; figures 1-3B * [Y] 2-13,16-27;
 [Y]DE102012208267  (OSRAM GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-27 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2012038490  (VERFUERTH NEAL R [US]) [Y] 1-27 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO2004057927  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-27 * the whole document *;
 [Y]AT11444U  (TRIDONICATCO GMBH & CO KG [AT]) [Y] 1-27 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] *;
 [Y]WO2013132416  (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [Y] 1-27 * paragraph [0049] *