Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3092287

EP3092287 - METHOD FOR CARBON DIOXIDE HYDROGENATION OF SYNGAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.07.2018  [2018/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Saudi Basic Industries Corporation
P.O. Box 5101
Riyadh 11422 / SA
[2016/46]
Inventor(s)01 / MAMEDOV, Aghaddin
1600 Industrial Blvd.
Sugar Land, Texas 77478 / US
 [2016/46]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2016/46]
Application number, filing date15700934.106.01.2015
[2016/46]
WO2015US10282
Priority number, dateUS201461923950P06.01.2014         Original published format: US 201461923950 P
[2016/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015103592
Date:09.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3092287
Date:16.11.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2015
[2016/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:C10K3/02, B01J23/883, C01B3/40
[2016/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/46]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR KOHLENDIOXID-HYDRIERUNG VON SYNGAS[2016/46]
English:METHOD FOR CARBON DIOXIDE HYDROGENATION OF SYNGAS[2016/46]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'HYDROGÉNATION DU DIOXYDE DE CARBONE D'UN GAZ DE SYNTHÈSE[2016/46]
Entry into regional phase19.07.2016National basic fee paid 
19.07.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.07.2016Examination requested  [2016/46]
13.02.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/28]
06.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XI]DE2308161  (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND) [X] 11-13 * examples 1, 2, 10 * [I] 1-10;
 [X]US2013149767  (MARION PIERRE [FR] ET AL) [X] 11-13 * paragraphs [0141] , [ 143] *;
 [I]US5399537  (BHATTACHARYYA ALAKANANDA [US] ET AL) [I] 11-13 * page 7, line 13 - line 16 *
by applicantUS1913364
 GB2168718
 GB2279583
 US5346679
 US3479149
 US5496530
 WO9606064
 WO2005026093
 EP1445232
 US2003113244
 US2010190874
 US2010150466