Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3096650

EP3096650 - MECHANISM FOR ACTUATING AN ADJUSTING DEVICE OF AN OFFICE-TYPE CHAIR AND AN ASSOCIATED ADJUSTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.10.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L.I.M.A. SNC Di Riccardo Ed Elisa Beccegato
Via Dell'Industria 7
35010 Trebaseleghe (PD) / IT
[2016/48]
Inventor(s)01 / BECCEGATO, Gino
c/o L.I.M.A. s.n.c.
Via dell'Industria 7
I-35010 Trebaseleghe (PD) / IT
 [2016/48]
Representative(s)Gregorj S.r.l.
Via L. Muratori, 13/b
20135 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2016/48]Postiglione, Ferruccio , et al
Gregorj S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Via L. Muratori, 13 b
20135 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date15701847.421.01.2015
[2016/48]
WO2015IB50459
Priority number, dateIT2014MI0008522.01.2014         Original published format: IT MI20140085
[2016/48]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015110964
Date:30.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3096650
Date:30.11.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2015
[2016/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3096650
Date:13.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:A47C1/024
[2016/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MECHANISMUS ZUR BETÄTIGUNG EINER EINSTELLVORRICHTUNG EINES BÜROSTUHLS UND ZUGEHÖRIGE EINSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2016/48]
English:MECHANISM FOR ACTUATING AN ADJUSTING DEVICE OF AN OFFICE-TYPE CHAIR AND AN ASSOCIATED ADJUSTING DEVICE[2016/48]
French:MÉCANISME DE COMMANDE D'UN DISPOSITIF D'AJUSTEMENT D'UNE CHAISE DE BUREAU ET DISPOSITIF D'AJUSTEMENT ASSOCIÉ[2016/48]
Entry into regional phase03.08.2016National basic fee paid 
03.08.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
03.08.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.08.2016Examination requested  [2016/48]
01.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.10.2017Fee for grant paid
30.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)14.09.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.12.2017
CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
DK13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
MC13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RO13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SI13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
IE21.01.2018
LU21.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
[2019/13]
Former [2019/09]AT13.12.2017
CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
DK13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
MC13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RO13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
IE21.01.2018
LU21.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2018/51]AT13.12.2017
CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
DK13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
MC13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RO13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
LU21.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2018/50]AT13.12.2017
CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
MC13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RO13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
LU21.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2018/47]AT13.12.2017
CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
MC13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RO13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
LU21.01.2018
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2018/44]AT13.12.2017
CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
MC13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RO13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2018/40]AT13.12.2017
CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RO13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2018/38]AT13.12.2017
CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2018/37]CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
Former [2018/34]FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
Former [2018/24]FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
Former [2018/23]FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
Former [2018/22]FI13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
NO13.03.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9707715  (GLOBAL UPHOLSTERY LTD [CA]; TEDESCO ROMEO [CA]) [A] 1-15 * page 10, line 1 - page 32, line 5; figures 1-17 *;
 [A]US4901594  (SELZER GUENTHER [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 35 - column 6, line 47; figures 1-5 *
by applicantEP2255697