Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3095247

EP3095247 - ROBUST LIVE OPERATION OF DASH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.08.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/47]
Inventor(s)01 / STOCKHAMMER, Thomas
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/47]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2016/47]
Application number, filing date15703165.916.01.2015
[2016/47]
WO2015US11817
Priority number, dateUS201461928381P16.01.2014         Original published format: US 201461928381 P
US20151459811015.01.2015         Original published format: US201514598110
[2016/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015109228
Date:23.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3095247
Date:23.11.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2015
[2016/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3095247
Date:02.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/61, H04N21/845
[2016/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ROBUSTER DASH LIVE-BEDIENUNG[2019/18]
English:ROBUST LIVE OPERATION OF DASH[2016/47]
French:ROBUSTE FONCTIONNEMENT DE DASH EN DIRECT[2019/18]
Former [2016/47]ROBUSTER LIVEBETRIEB VON DASH
Former [2016/47]OPÉRATION EN DIRECT ROBUSTE DE DASH
Entry into regional phase09.06.2016National basic fee paid 
09.06.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
09.06.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.04.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/47]
27.02.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2019Fee for grant paid
23.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]US2013091251  (WALKER GORDON KENT [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0105] *;
 [I]US2012272281  (HA HO-JIN [KR], et al) [I] 1-30 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0089] *;
 [A]  - "Guidelines for Implementation: DASH-AVC/264 Interoperability Points DASH Industry Forum", (20130815), URL: http://dashif.org/w/2013/08/DASH-AVC-264-v2.00-hd-mca.pdf, (20150306), XP055174477 [A] 1-30 * paragraph [03.3] * * paragraph [03.4] * * paragraph [03.5] * * paragraph [09.3] *