Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3096748

EP3096748 - METHODS FOR ALTERING SHEAR FORCE-INDUCED PLATELET ACTIVATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/48]MATERIALS, METHODS AND DEVICES FOR ALTERING CELL REACTIVITY
[2019/07]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Arizona Board of Regents on behalf of the University of Arizona
The University of Arizona Tech Transfer Arizona
220 W. Sixth Street
4th Floor
Tucson, AZ 85701 / US
[2019/39]
Former [2016/48]For all designated states
The Arizona Board of Regents on behalf of the University of Arizona
The University of Arizona Tech Transfer Arizona
220 W. Sixth Street
4th Floor
Tucson, AZ 85701 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SLEPIAN, Marvin J.
Sarver Heart Center
Building 201E, Room 5146
1501 North Campbell Avenue
Tucson, Arizona 85724 / US
 [2016/48]
Representative(s)Gill, Siân Victoria , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[2019/39]
Former [2016/48]Cowley, Catherine Mary
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date15704426.426.01.2015
[2016/48]
WO2015US12960
Priority number, dateUS201461931398P24.01.2014         Original published format: US 201461931398 P
[2016/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015113001
Date:30.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3096748
Date:30.11.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2015
[2016/48]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3096748
Date:25.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/10, C12N5/078, A61K31/165, A61K31/202
[2016/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERÄNDERUNG VON SCHERKRAFT-INDUZIERTER BLUTPLÄTTCHENAKTIVIERUNG[2019/07]
English:METHODS FOR ALTERING SHEAR FORCE-INDUCED PLATELET ACTIVATION[2019/07]
French:PROCÉDÉS POUR MODIFIER L'ACTIVATION DE PLAQUETTES SANGUINES PAR EFFORT TRANCHANT[2019/07]
Former [2016/48]MATERIALIEN, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR VERÄNDERUNG DER ZELLREAKTIVITÄT
Former [2016/48]MATERIALS, METHODS AND DEVICES FOR ALTERING CELL REACTIVITY
Former [2016/48]MATÉRIAUX, PROCÉDÉS ET DISPOSITIFS POUR MODIFIER LA RÉACTIVITÉ DE CELLULES
Entry into regional phase03.06.2016National basic fee paid 
03.06.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
03.06.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/48]
10.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.11.2018
23.11.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
22.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
06.08.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
14.08.2019Fee for grant paid
14.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
14.08.2019Request for further processing filed
14.08.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO0069429  (HEARTDRUG RES L L C [US]; SEREBRUANY VICTOR L [US]; GURBEL PAUL A [US]) [X] 1-13,17,20-26 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; page 1, line 21 - page 3, line 22; page 10, lines 4-15;; figures 1-11; examples 1-3; claims 1-37 * [A] 14-16,18,19,27-29;
 [XA]WO2005113006  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE]; BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE]; EISER) [X] 1-15,17,20-29 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; page 4, line 19 - page 8, line 22; page 32, line 19 - page 34, line 17;; example 1; claims 1-10 * [A] 16,18,19;
 [XA]WO2007005180  (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]; CONSIGNY PAUL [US]; ASONGWE GABRI) [X] 1-16,20-28 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; page 1, line 28 - page 4, line 20; page 15, line 28 - page 17, line 22; page 32, line 9 - page 33, line 25; page 51, line 23 - page 52, line 31;; figures 1-6; claims 1-104 * [A] 17-19,29;
 [XA]EP0684762  (BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL [US]) [X] 1-13,18-26 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; page 4, lines 1-56; page 5, line 20 - page 8, line 6;; figures 1-10; examples 1-4; claims 1-38 * [A] 14-17,27-29;
 [A]WO03094915  (NOVARTIS AG [CH]; NOVARTIS PHARMA GMBH [AT]; MALININ ALEX [US]; SEREBR) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO03085400  (HEMODYNE INC [US]) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *;
 [XA]  - SEREBRUANY V ET AL, "DIPYRIDAMOLE DECREASES PROTEASE-ACTIVATED RECEPTOR AND ANNEXIN-V BINDING ON PLATELETS OF POSTSTROKE PATIENTS WITH ASPIRIN NONRESPONSIVENESS", CEREBROVASCULAR DISEASES, KARGER, BASEL, CH, (20060101), vol. 21, no. 1-2, doi:10.1159/000090207, ISSN 1015-9770, pages 98 - 105, XP008070363 [X] 1-13,17,20-26 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; methods; results;; figure 1; tables 1, 2 * [A] 14-16,18,19,27-29

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000090207
 [XA]  - SANIABADI A R ET AL, "EFFECT OF DIPYRIDAMOLE ALONE AND IN COMBINATION WITH ASPIRIN ON WHOLE BLOOD PLATELET AGGREGATION, PGI2 GENERATION, AND RED CELL DEFORMABILITY EX VIVO IN MAN", CARDIOVASCULAR RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, GB, (19910101), vol. 25, doi:10.1093/CVR/25.3.177, ISSN 0008-6363, pages 177 - 183, XP002951067 [X] 1-13,17,20-26 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; methods; results;; figures 1-4 * [A] 14-16,18,19,27-29

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/cvr/25.3.177
 [XA]  - MARGARET B LUCITT ET AL, "Assaying the efficacy of dual-antiplatelet therapy: use of a controlled-shear-rate microfluidic device with a well-defined collagen surface to track dynamic platelet adhesion", ANALYTICAL AND BIOANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (20130501), vol. 405, no. 14, doi:10.1007/s00216-013-6897-y, ISSN 1618-2642, pages 4823 - 4834, XP055176553 [X] 1-13,17,20-26 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; materials and methods; results;; figures 1-5; tables 1-3 * [A] 14-16,18,19,27-29

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00216-013-6897-y
 [XA]  - PAUL A. GURBEL ET AL, "Evaluation of platelets in heart failure: Is platelet activity related to etiology, functional class, or clinical outcomes?", AMERICAN HEART JOURNAL, (20020601), vol. 143, no. 6, doi:10.1067/mhj.2002.121261, ISSN 0002-8703, pages 1068 - 1075, XP055176554 [X] 1-13,17,20-26 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; methods; results;; tables I-VIII * [A] 14-16,18,19,27-29

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1067/mhj.2002.121261
 [XA]  - VICTOR L SEREBRUANY ET AL, "Clinical Utility of the Platelet Function Analyzer (PFA-100) for the Assessment of the Platelet Status in Patients with Congestive Heart Failure (EPCOT trial)", THROMBOSIS RESEARCH, (20010301), vol. 101, no. 6, doi:10.1016/S0049-3848(00)00431-X, ISSN 0049-3848, pages 427 - 433, XP055176556 [X] 1-13,17,20-26 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; methods; results;; figures 1-4; tables 1, 2 * [A] 14-16,18,19,27-29

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0049-3848(00)00431-X
 [XA]  - JAWAAD SHERIFF ET AL, "Comparative efficacy of in vitro and in vivo metabolized aspirin in the DeBakey ventricular assist device", JOURNAL OF THROMBOSIS AND THROMBOLYSIS, (201405), vol. 37, no. 4, doi:10.1007/s11239-013-0997-6, ISSN 0929-5305, pages 499 - 506, XP055176563 [X] 1-13,17,20-26 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; materials and methods; results;; figures 1-5; table 1 * * Published online 17-09-2013 * [A] 14-16,18,19,27-29

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11239-013-0997-6
 [XA]  - VICTOR L. SEREBRUANY ET AL, "Uniform platelet activation exists before coronary stent implantation despite aspirin therapy", AMERICAN HEART JOURNAL, (20011001), vol. 142, no. 4, doi:10.1067/mhj.2001.116478, ISSN 0002-8703, pages 611 - 616, XP055176555 [X] 1-13,17,20-26 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; methods; results;; tables I, II * [A] 14-16,18,19,27-29

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1067/mhj.2001.116478
 [XA]  - VALERIE S. HORNSEY ET AL, "Freezing of buffy coat-derived, leukoreduced platelet concentrates in 6 percent dimethyl sulfoxide", TRANSFUSION, (20081201), vol. 48, no. 12, doi:10.1111/j.1537-2995.2008.01884.x, ISSN 0041-1132, pages 2508 - 2514, XP055176545 [X] 1-13,16,20-26 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; materials and methods; results;; figure 1; table 1 * [A] 14,15,17-19,27-29

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1537-2995.2008.01884.x
 [XA]  - SANDEEP KHURANA ET AL, "Monitoring platelet glycoprotein IIb/IIIa-fibrin interaction with tissue factor-activated thromboelastography", JOURNAL OF LABORATORY AND CLINICAL MEDICINE, (19971001), vol. 130, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S0022-2143(97)90040-8, ISSN 0022-2143, pages 401 - 411, XP055176559 [X] 1-13,18-26 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; methods; results;; figures 1-8 * [A] 14-17,27-29

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-2143(97)90040-8
 [XA]  - SAJILA SHEIKH ET AL, "Treatment of neutrophils with cytochalasins converts rolling to stationary adhesion on P-selectin", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR PHYSIOLOGY, (19980201), vol. 174, no. 2, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1097-4652(199802)174:2<206::AID-JCP8>3.0.CO;2-S, ISSN 0021-9541, pages 206 - 216, XP055176558 [X] 1-13,18-26 * the whole document * * in particular: abstract; materials and methods; results;; figures 1-6; table 1 * [A] 14-17,27-29

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-4652(199802)174:2<206::AID-JCP8>3.0.CO;2-S
 [A]  - JAWAAD SHERIFF ET AL, "Evaluation of Shear-Induced Platelet Activation Models Under Constant and Dynamic Shear Stress Loading Conditions Relevant to Devices", ANNALS OF BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, (20130601), vol. 41, no. 6, doi:10.1007/s10439-013-0758-x, ISSN 0090-6964, pages 1279 - 1296, XP055176530 [A] 1-29 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10439-013-0758-x
 [A]  - JOAO S. SOARES ET AL, "Simulation of Platelets Suspension Flowing Through a Stenosis Model Using a Dissipative Particle Dynamics Approach", ANNALS OF BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, (20131122), vol. 41, no. 11, doi:10.1007/s10439-013-0829-z, ISSN 0090-6964, pages 2318 - 2333, XP055176560 [A] 1-29 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10439-013-0829-z
 [A]  - XENOS M ET AL, "Device Thrombogenicity Emulator (DTE) - Design optimization methodology for cardiovascular devices: A study in two bileaflet MHV designs", JOURNAL OF BIOMECHANICS, PERGAMON PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 43, no. 12, ISSN 0021-9290, (20100826), pages 2400 - 2409, (20100521), XP027206868 [A] 1-29 * the whole document *
 [AP]  - PENG ZHANG ET AL, "Multiscale Particle-Based Modeling of Flowing Platelets in Blood Plasma Using Dissipative Particle Dynamics and Coarse Grained Molecular Dynamics", CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR BIOENGINEERING, (20141201), vol. 7, no. 4, doi:10.1007/s12195-014-0356-5, ISSN 1865-5025, pages 552 - 574, XP055176527 [AP] 1-29 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12195-014-0356-5
 [AP]  - SEETHA POTHAPRAGADA ET AL, "A phenomenological particle-based platelet model for simulating filopodia formation during early activation", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL FOR NUMERICAL METHODS IN BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, (20141201), doi:10.1002/cnm.2702, ISSN 2040-7939, pages n/a - n/a, XP055176537 [AP] 1-29 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cnm.2702
by applicant   - BERSHADSKY ET AL., CURRENT OPINION IN CELL BIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 18, pages 472 - 481
    - WEHRLE-HALLER ET AL., TRENDS IN CELL BIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 12, no. 8, pages 382 - 389
    - GEIGER ET AL., CELL, (2002), vol. 110, pages 139 - 142
    - GEIGER ET AL., CURRENT OPINION IN CELL BIOLOGY, (2001), vol. 13, pages 584 - 592
    - WEYANT ET AL., "Colon cancer chemoprotective drugs modulate integrin-mediated signaling pathways", CLIN CANCER ES, (2000), vol. 6, page 949
    - LEE ET AL., "Water channels in platelet volume regulation", J CELL MOL MED, (2012), vol. 16, page 945
    - DU ET AL., "Grafted poly- (ethylene glycol) on lipid surfaces inhibits protein adsorption and cell adhesion", BBA BIOMEMBRANES, (1997), vol. 1326, doi:doi:10.1016/S0005-2736(97)00027-8, page 236, XP002090691

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0005-2736(97)00027-8
    - MARSH, "Lipid membranes with grafted polymers: physicochemical aspects", BBA BIOMEMBRANES, (2003), vol. 1615, doi:doi:10.1016/S0005-2736(03)00197-4, page 33, XP004451109

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0005-2736(03)00197-4
    - GIRDHAR ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2012), vol. 7, no. 3, page E32463
    - MACLEAN-FLETCHER, CELL, (1980), vol. 20, no. 2, pages 329 - 41
    - VISEGRADY ET AL., FEBS LETT, (2004), vol. 565, no. 1-3, pages 163 - 166
    - SKOUFIAS, BIOCEHMISTRY, (1992), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 738 - 746
    - ARNAL ET AL., "Taxol on the other has been shown to stabilize microtubules", CURR. BIOL., (1995), vol. 5, no. 8, pages 900 - 908