Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3094273

EP3094273 - DEVICES AND METHODS FOR FORMING VASCULAR ACCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.03.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.05.2019  [2019/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Volcano Corporation
3721 Valley Center Drive
Suite 500
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
[2016/47]
Inventor(s)01 / MATSUBARA, Bradley, S.
521 W. Citracado Parkway
Escondido, CA 92025 / US
02 / UNSER, John
34331 Coppola Street
Temecula, CA 92591 / US
 [2016/47]
Representative(s)Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2016/47]
Application number, filing date15704868.714.01.2015
[2016/47]
WO2015US11357
Priority number, dateUS201461927054P14.01.2014         Original published format: US 201461927054 P
[2016/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015108941
Date:23.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3094273
Date:23.11.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2015
[2016/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/34, A61B17/32, A61M1/36
[2016/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/47]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR BILDUNG EINES GEFÄSSZUGANGS[2016/47]
English:DEVICES AND METHODS FOR FORMING VASCULAR ACCESS[2016/47]
French:DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS DE FORMATION D'UN ACCÈS VASCULAIRE[2016/47]
Entry into regional phase16.08.2016National basic fee paid 
16.08.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
16.08.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.08.2016Examination requested  [2016/47]
05.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/18]
12.12.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201905   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US6375615  (FLAHERTY J CHRISTOPHER [US] ET AL) [X] 12-14,17 * column 8, line 7 - column 13, line 51; figures 3-7f * [Y] 29-34 [I] 15,16;
 [Y]CA2616760  (ROX MEDICAL INC [US]) [Y] 29-34 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0060]; figures 1-10 *;
 [AD]US6190353  (MAKOWER JOSHUA [US] ET AL) [AD] 16,33 * column 25, line 29 - line 60; figure 5d *
by applicantUS5830222
 US6068638
 US6159225
 US6190353
 US6283951
 US6375615
 US6508824
 US6544230
 US6655386
 US6579311
 US6602241
 US6660024
 US6685648
 US6709444
 US6726677
 US6746464
 US2006241342
 US7736317
 US6780157
 US6457365
 US2010220334
 US4794931
 US5000185
 US5313949
 US5243988
 US5353798
 US4951677
 US5095911
 US4841977
 US5373849
 US5176141
 US5240003
 US5375602
 US5373845
 US5453575
 US5368037
 US5183048
 US5167233
 US4917097
 US5135486
 US2009284332
 US2009195514
 US2007232933
 US2005249391
 US8108030
 US2011152771
 US2009043191
 US2008291463
 US2008180683
 US5321501
 US7999938
 US7995210
 US7787127
 US7783337
 US6134003
 US6421164
 WO2014109879
 US6659957
 US7527594
 US7245789
 US7447388
 US7660492
 US8059923
 US2008119739
 US2010087732
 US2012108943
 US2012230565
 US2011319752
 US2013030295
 US6106476
 US5125137
 US6551250
 US5873835
 US6200268
 US6381350
 US7074188
 US7175597
 US7215802
 US7359554
 US7463759
    - YAO WANG; DOUGLAS N. STEPHENS; MATTHEW O'DONNELLIE, "Optimizing the Beam Pattern of a Forward-Viewing Ring-Annular Ultrasound Array for Intravascular imaging", TRANSACTIONS ON ULTRASONICS, FERROELECTRICS, AND FREQUENCY CONTROL, (200212), vol. 49, no. 12
    - FLEMING C. P.; WANG H.; QUAN, K. J.; ROLLINS A. M., "Real-time monitoring of cardiac radio-frequency ablation lesion formation using an optical coherence tomography forward-imaging catheter.", J. BIOMED. OPT., (2010), vol. 15, no. 3, pages 030516 - 030513
    - WANG H; KANG W; CARRIGAN T ET AL., "In vivo intracardiac optical coherence tomography imaging through percutaneous access: toward image-guided radio-frequency ablation", J. BIOMED. OPT., vol. 16, no. 11, pages 110505 - 110505,3
    - SEWARD ET AL., MAYO CLINIC PROCEEDINGS, (1996), vol. 71, no. 7, pages 629 - 635
    - PACKER ET AL., "Ultrasound Cardioscopy", EUR. J.C.P.E., (199406), vol. 4, no. 2, page 193
    - "Spectral Radar", OPTICS LETTERS, (1996), vol. 21, no. 14, pages 1087 - 1089
    - SMITH, L. M.; C. C. DOBSON, APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 28, pages 3339 - 3342