Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3100492

EP3100492 - DISTRIBUTED CLUSTERING OF WIRELESS NETWORK NODES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.09.2019
Database last updated on 19.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.02.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/49]
Inventor(s)01 / CELEBI, Samel
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / DAS, Soumya
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / HWANG, Insoo
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/49]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2016/49]
Application number, filing date15704888.528.01.2015
[2016/49]
WO2015US13331
Priority number, dateUS20141417040831.01.2014         Original published format: US201414170408
[2016/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015116704
Date:06.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3100492
Date:07.12.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2015
[2016/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/02
[2016/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/49]
TitleGerman:VERTEILTE GRUPPIERUNG VON DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERKKNOTEN[2016/49]
English:DISTRIBUTED CLUSTERING OF WIRELESS NETWORK NODES[2016/49]
French:REGROUPEMENT DISTRIBUÉ DE NOEUDS DE RÉSEAU SANS FIL[2019/37]
Former [2016/49]REGROUPEMENT DISTRIBUÉ DE N UDS DE RÉSEAU SANS FIL
Entry into regional phase30.06.2016National basic fee paid 
30.06.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.2016Examination requested  [2016/49]
30.06.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
16.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]US2013077494  (SAMDANIS KONSTANTINOS [DE]) [X] 1-30 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0067]; figure 3 *;
 [A]  - Falko Dressler, "Clustering", Self-Organization in Sensor and Actor Networks, Chichester, UK, John Wiley & Sons, Ltd, (20071116), pages 185 - 202, doi:10.1002/9780470724460.ch12, ISBN 978-0-47-002820-9, XP055180067 [A] 1-30 * page 185 - page 190 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/9780470724460.ch12
 [A]  - XIONG ZHOU ET AL, "Game-theoretical frequency reuse method for complex cognitive femto-cell network", 2013 8TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING IN CHINA (CHINACOM), IEEE, (20130814), doi:10.1109/CHINACOM.2013.6694613, pages 318 - 322, XP032546802 [A] 1-30 * paragraph [III.A] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ChinaCom.2013.6694613
 [A]  - RENESAS MOBILE EUROPE LTD, "Cell-Clustering in Rel-12 Deployment Scenarios", vol. RAN WG1, no. Barcelona, Spain; 20130819 - 20130823, (20130809), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-133239, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_74/Docs/, (20130809), XP050716055 [A] 1-30 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] *