Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3234779

EP3234779 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR CONNECTING DEVICES TO APPLICATIONS AND DESKTOPS THAT ARE RECEIVING MAINTENANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.10.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.10.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.05.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.10.2018(Expected) grantpublished on 28.11.2018  [2018/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Citrix Systems Inc.
851 West Cypress Creek Road
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309 / US
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / SINGLETON IV, Leo C.
2715 N. Ocean Blvd. 18F
Fort Lauderdale, Florida 33308 / US
 [2017/43]
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[2018/48]
Former [2017/43]Murgitroyd & Company
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date15705171.503.02.2015
[2017/43]
WO2015US14323
Priority number, dateUS20141457134216.12.2014         Original published format: US201414571342
[2017/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016099587
Date:23.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3234779
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016
[2017/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3234779
Date:28.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/14
[2017/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUM VERBINDEN VON VORRICHTUNGEN MIT ANWENDUNGEN UND DESKTOPS UNTER WARTUNG[2017/43]
English:METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR CONNECTING DEVICES TO APPLICATIONS AND DESKTOPS THAT ARE RECEIVING MAINTENANCE[2017/43]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES PERMETTANT DE CONNECTER DES DISPOSITIFS À DES APPLICATIONS ET ORDINATEURS DE BUREAUX FAISANT L'OBJET D'UNE MAINTENANCE[2017/43]
Entry into regional phase06.07.2017National basic fee paid 
06.07.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
06.07.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/43]
06.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.08.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
28.08.2018Fee for grant paid
28.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.10.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
10.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[I]US2014108775  (KLUDY THOMAS M [US], et al) [I] 1-29 * paragraphs [0006] - [0009] - [0034] , [0043] - [0053] - [0061] - [0098] * * claim 13 * * figures 1-6 *;
 [I]US2010131946  (DEGAONKAR SUMEDH [IN], et al) [I] 1-29 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] - [0035] - [0054] - [0060] - [0062] - [0093] , [0096] - [0106] - [0157] - [0160] - [0175] - [0188] * * figures 1a, 1d, 2b, 3, 5a, 5b *