Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3004178

EP3004178 - METHODS FOR PRODUCING SUGARS FROM CARBOHYDRATE-RICH SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/15]METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR PRODUCING SUGARS FROM CARBOHYDRATE-RICH SUBSTRATES
[2018/17]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.06.2018
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip14.08.2018Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hamrick, Edward Brian
16850 Collins Avenue
Ste. 112-711
Sunny Isles Beach, Florida 33160 / US
[2016/15]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2016/15]
Representative(s)Lee, Nicholas John , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/31]Hart, Deborah Mary , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
Former [2016/15]Hart, Deborah Mary , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London
WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date15705419.829.01.2015
[2016/15]
WO2015US13389
Priority number, dateUS201461934799P02.02.2014         Original published format: US 201461934799 P
US20151460818328.01.2015         Original published format: US201514608183
[2016/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015116742
Date:06.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3004178
Date:13.04.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2015
[2016/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3004178
Date:01.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:C12P19/02, C12P7/14, C12P7/16, C13K1/02, C12P19/14, C08H8/00
[2018/17]
Former International [2016/15]C08B37/00, C08H8/00, C12P19/14, C13K1/02, C13K1/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZUCKERN AUS KOHLENHYDRATREICHEN SUBSTRATEN[2018/17]
English:METHODS FOR PRODUCING SUGARS FROM CARBOHYDRATE-RICH SUBSTRATES[2018/17]
French:PROCÉDÉS POUR PRODUIRE DES SUCRES À PARTIR DE SUBSTRATS RICHES EN GLUCIDES[2018/17]
Former [2016/15]VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZUCKERN AUS KOHLENHYDRATREICHEN SUBSTRATEN
Former [2016/15]METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR PRODUCING SUGARS FROM CARBOHYDRATE-RICH SUBSTRATES
Former [2016/15]PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES POUR PRODUIRE DES SUCRES À PARTIR DE SUBSTRATS RICHES EN GLUCIDES
Entry into regional phase22.10.2015National basic fee paid 
22.10.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
22.10.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.10.2015Examination requested  [2016/15]
07.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.06.2018Fee for grant paid
21.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201703   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2017
Cited inInternational search[XAI]WO0132715  (WASTE ENERGY INTEGRATED SYTEMS [US], et al) [X] 1-7,12-14,25-27 * Embodiment 1; pages 11-13; claims 1,3,5-8,13,17,21-24,27-30; tables 1,2 * * pages 27-32 * [A] 22 [I] 10;
 [X]US3212932  (HESS ROBERT W, et al) [X] 1,3,5-7,10,12-14,25-29 * column 1, line 44 - column 4; example .; claims 1-10 *;
 [XI]US2009093028  (DORAN PETERSON JOY [US], et al) [X] 25-28,30 * paragraphs [0041] - [0044] - [0046] , [0047] , [0074] - [0077]; figure 1; example 1; claim -; table 1 * [I] 29;
 [X]EP0044658  (FOODY PATRICK) [X] 25-28,30 * page 14, paragraph 26 - page 17, paragraph 1; figure 5; examples 1,3; claims 1,4,10,11,15 *;
 [XI]US5411594  (BRELSFORD DONALD L [US]) [X] 25-28 * claims 1-10 * [I] 1-7,14;
 [XI]WO2006024242  (BIOTECH PROGRESS A S [CZ], et al) [X] 25-28 * claims 1-6,10,11 * [I] 1-7,14;
 [X]US2010270499  (FANG ZHEN [CN], et al) [X] 28 * paragraphs [0036] - [0036] - [0107] , [0108]; figure 8 *;
 [XA]US2003173291  (SCHIMEL KEITH A [US]) [X] 28 * claims 1-17 * [A] 15,18-20;
 [XA]WO2013025564  (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 28 * page 9, paragraph l - page 11, line 14; figure 1; claim - * [A] 1-27;
 [AD]US2006289132  (HEIJNESSON-HULTEN ANETTE [SE]) [AD] 8,23 * paragraph [0028]; example -; claims 1,2,12 *;
 [A]WO2004081185  (ATHENIX CORP [US], et al) [A] 9,11,16,17 * example 23; claims 1-4,9,10-17,21-24; table 27 *;
 [A]WO2012155239  (MASCOMA CANADA INC [CA], et al) [A] 9,11,15-20,24 * paragraphs [0062] - [0066] - [0082] , [0083] , [0085] , [0088] - [0090] *
by applicantUS7700764
    - GIBSON, "The hierarchical structure and mechanics of plant materials", JOURNAL OF THE ROYAL SOCIETY INTERFACE, (2012), vol. 9, no. 76, pages 2749 - 2766
    - "Raman Imaging of Lignocellulosic Feedstock", GIERLINGER ET AL., Cellulose - Biomass Conversion, (2013), page 159
    - GIERLINGER, "Revealing changes in molecular composition of plant cell walls on the micron-level by Raman mapping and vertex component analysis (VCA", FRONTIERS IN PLANT SCIENCE, (2014), vol. 5
    - NELSON, "Apparent activation energy of hydrolysis of some cellulosic materials", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE, (1960), vol. 43, no. 142, pages 351 - 371
    - PENG ET AL., "Chemistry and applications of nanocrystalline cellulose and its derivatives: a nanotechnology perspective", THE CANADIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL ENGINEERING, (2011), vol. 89, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1002/cjce.20554, pages 1191 - 1206, XP002756812

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cjce.20554
    - LAN ET AL., "Enzymatic saccharification of lignocelluloses should be conducted at elevated pH 5.2-6.2", BIOENERGY RESEARCH, (2013), vol. 6, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1007/s12155-012-9273-4, pages 476 - 485, XP002743703

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12155-012-9273-4
    - AZHAR ET AL., "Extraction of hemicelluloses from fiberized spruce wood", CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS, (2015), vol. 117, doi:doi:10.1016/j.carbpol.2014.09.050, pages 19 - 24, XP029113641

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbpol.2014.09.050
    - XU ET AL., "Kinetics of acid hydrolysis of water-soluble spruce O-acetyl galactoglucomannans", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (2008), vol. 56, no. 7, pages 2429 - 2435