Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3111516

EP3111516 - ASSEMBLY FOR DISTRIBUTING CURRENT IN A LOW-VOLTAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.12.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CZ, DK
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 16
32758 Detmold / DE
[2017/01]
Inventor(s)01 / BÖCKER, Marc
Lindenkamp 37
32839 Steinheim / DE
02 / GERKENS, Michael
Hallerweg 43
33617 Bielefeld / DE
03 / HÄHNEL, Andreas
Schnathorsterstrasse 203
32609 Hüllhorst-Schnathorst / DE
04 / LANGE, Stephan
Grosses Holz 14
32657 Lemgo / DE
05 / SCHÜRMANN, Klaus
Ernst Reuterstrasse 31
32791 Lage / DE
06 / TEMPEL, Ralph
Leistruper Waldstrasse 24A
32760 Detmold / DE
 [2017/01]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/01]
Application number, filing date15706034.424.02.2015
[2017/01]
WO2015EP53854
Priority number, dateDE201420100829U24.02.2014         Original published format: DE 202014100829 U
[2017/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015124800
Date:27.08.2015
Language:DE
[2015/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3111516
Date:04.01.2017
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015
[2017/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3111516
Date:08.05.2019
Language:DE
[2019/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01R9/26, H02J1/06, H05K7/02
[2017/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG ZUR STROMVERTEILUNG IN EINEM NIEDERSPANNUNGSSYSTEM[2017/01]
English:ASSEMBLY FOR DISTRIBUTING CURRENT IN A LOW-VOLTAGE SYSTEM[2017/01]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION DE COURANT DANS UN SYSTÈME BASSE TENSION[2017/01]
Entry into regional phase08.09.2016National basic fee paid 
08.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/01]
08.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
03.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
04.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2019Fee for grant paid
01.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Request for further processing for:03.08.2017Request for further processing filed
03.08.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.08.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL08.05.2019
CZ08.05.2019
DK08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
HR08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
LV08.05.2019
NL08.05.2019
RS08.05.2019
BG08.08.2019
NO08.08.2019
GR09.08.2019
PT08.09.2019
[2020/09]
Former [2019/51]AL08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
HR08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
LV08.05.2019
NL08.05.2019
RS08.05.2019
BG08.08.2019
NO08.08.2019
GR09.08.2019
PT08.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
HR08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
LV08.05.2019
NL08.05.2019
RS08.05.2019
NO08.08.2019
GR09.08.2019
PT08.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
HR08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
NL08.05.2019
NO08.08.2019
PT08.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
NO08.08.2019
PT08.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
NO08.08.2019
Cited inInternational search[I]US4680674  (MOORE FERGUS E [US]) [I] 1-10 * Spalte 15, Zeile 30-Spalte 16, Zeile 34;; figures 1,11 *;
 [A]US3054024  (DILLEN PAUL VAN, et al) [A] 1-10 * Spalte 3, Zeile 5 to Spalte 4, Zeile 64;; figures 5-12 *