Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3256062

EP3256062 - RIB RECONSTRUCTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.04.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.11.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  12.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
56 East Bell Drive
Warsaw, IN 46582 / US
[2017/51]
Inventor(s)01 / SMITS, Aaron
6728 Post Road
Fort Wayne, Indiana 46814-9404 / US
02 / BAVER, Brett
7584 Shawnee Ln., Unit 326
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
03 / COURTNEY, Megan
1831 Red Oak Drive
Plover, Wisconsin 54467 / US
 [2019/39]
Former [2017/51]01 / SMITS, Aaron
13618 Veracruz Drive
Fort Wayne, Indiana 46814 / US
02 / BAVER, Brett
7584 Shawnee Ln., Unit 326
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
03 / COURTNEY, Megan
1831 Red Oak Drive
Plover, Wisconsin 54467 / US
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2017/51]
Application number, filing date15706135.913.02.2015
[2017/51]
WO2015US15904
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016130154
Date:18.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3256062
Date:20.12.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2016
[2017/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3256062
Date:25.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/80, A61B17/82, A61B17/70, A61B17/56
[2017/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:RIPPENREKONSTRUKTIONSVORRICHTUNG[2017/51]
English:RIB RECONSTRUCTION DEVICE[2017/51]
French:DISPOSITIF DE RECONSTRUCTION DE CÔTE[2017/51]
Entry into regional phase12.09.2017National basic fee paid 
12.09.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
12.09.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.09.2017Examination requested  [2017/51]
12.09.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.08.2019Fee for grant paid
13.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
08.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]FR3004337  (NEURO FRANCE IMPLANTS NFI [FR]) [A] 1,16,20 * page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 26 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5261908  (CAMPBELL JR ROBERT M [US]) [A] 1,9,16,20 * column 5, lines 20-24 * * column 13, lines 19-53 * * figures 25, 26A-26C *;
 [A]US2008234742  (CASCARINO JOSE LUDOVICO [AR]) [A] 1,16,20 * page 2, paragraph 25 - page 3, line 34 * * figures 1-6 *