Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3105796

EP3105796 - FINFET WITH BACKGATE, WITHOUT PUNCHTHROUGH, AND WITH REDUCED FIN HEIGHT VARIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/51]
Inventor(s)01 / YANG, Bin
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / LI, Xia
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / CHIDAMBARAM, Pr
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / YEAP, Choh Fei
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/51]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2016/51]
Application number, filing date15706346.211.02.2015
[2016/51]
WO2015US15426
Priority number, dateUS20141417931112.02.2014         Original published format: US201414179311
[2016/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015123305
Date:20.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3105796
Date:21.12.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2015
[2016/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01L29/66, H01L29/78
[2016/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/51]
TitleGerman:FINFET MIT BACKGATE, OHNE PUNCHTHROUGH UND MIT REDUZIERTER RIPPENHÖHENVERÄNDERUNG[2016/51]
English:FINFET WITH BACKGATE, WITHOUT PUNCHTHROUGH, AND WITH REDUCED FIN HEIGHT VARIATION[2016/51]
French:FINFET À GRILLE ARRIÈRE, SANS PERÇAGE, ET À VARIATION RÉDUITE DE HAUTEUR D'AILETTE[2016/51]
Entry into regional phase06.07.2016National basic fee paid 
06.07.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
06.07.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.07.2016Examination requested  [2016/51]
06.07.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.09.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
07.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201905   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[IY]US2006197129  (WOHLMUTH WALTER A [US]) [I] 1-7,10-17,21,23-30 * the whole document * [Y] 8,9,18-20,22;
 [Y]US2013011983  (TSAI JI-YIN [TW] ET AL) [Y] 8,9,18-20,22 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0015] *;
 [A]US2009008705  (ZHU HUILONG [US] ET AL) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0073] *;
 [A]US2008237636  (JIN BEEN-YIH [US] ET AL) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0021] *;
 [A]US2010163926  (HUDAIT MANTU K [US] ET AL) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] *;
 [A]US2013049069  (ZHU HUILONG [US] ET AL) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0043] *;
 [A]US2006286724  (ANDERSON BRENT A [US] ET AL) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2013099282  (CHEN CHI-MING [TW] ET AL) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0023] *;
 [A]US2013234147  (WU CHENG-HSIEN [TW] ET AL) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] *;
 [A]US2013154007  (CHENG KANGGUO [US] ET AL) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0075] *;
 [A]US2013285153  (LEE TSUNG-LIN [TW] ET AL) [A] 8,9,18-20 * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0038] *;
 [A]US2012012932  (PERNG TSU-HSIU [TW] ET AL) [A] 8,9,18-20 * the whole document *