Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3117230 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3117230



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 226
14.02.2020 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
24.10.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
03.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.02.2017 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 2
21.12.2016 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
25.10.2016 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
21.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.10.2016 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 4
27.09.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
06.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.09.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
22.07.2016 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
05.10.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37
17.09.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
17.09.2015 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 36
01.04.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
01.04.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
01.04.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 5
05.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
05.03.2015 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
05.03.2015 Claims PCT receiving Office 4
05.03.2015 Description PCT receiving Office 22
05.03.2015 Drawings PCT receiving Office 8
05.03.2015 Incoming communication concerning PCT Direct PCT receiving Office 34
05.03.2015 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 36