Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3117230


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.02.2020 Change - applicant published on  18.03.2020 [2020/12]
21.10.2019 Change - representative
03.04.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.04.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.05.2017 Change: Validation states published on  21.06.2017  [2017/25]
19.05.2017 Change - extension states published on  21.06.2017  [2017/25]
04.04.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.02.2017 Amendment by applicant
16.12.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
16.12.2016 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
16.12.2016 Request for examination filed published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
23.11.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
18.10.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
07.10.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
07.09.2016 Change - representative
07.09.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
21.09.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
18.09.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
28.03.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
13.03.2015 PCT data prior to European publication