Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3117230

EP3117230 - MAGNETIC RESONANCE ANTENNA WITH ELECTRONIC DOSIMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip14.02.2020Change - applicantpublished on 18.03.2020 [2020/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 52
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[2020/12]
Former [2017/03]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / WIRTZ, Daniel
c/o High Tech Campus 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / LEUSSLER, Christoph
c/o High Tech Campus 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2017/03]
Representative(s)Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2017/03]Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date15707955.905.03.2015
[2017/03]
WO2015EP54598
Priority number, dateEP2014015935913.03.2014         Original published format: EP 14159359
[2017/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015135825
Date:17.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3117230
Date:18.01.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2015
[2017/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:G01R33/34, G01R33/48, A61N5/10, G01R33/28, G01R33/3415
[2017/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/03]
TitleGerman:MAGNETRESONANZANTENNE MIT ELEKTRONISCHEN DOSIMETERN[2017/03]
English:MAGNETIC RESONANCE ANTENNA WITH ELECTRONIC DOSIMETERS[2017/03]
French:ANTENNE À RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE COMPRENANT DES DOSIMÈTRES ÉLECTRONIQUES[2017/03]
Entry into regional phase13.10.2016National basic fee paid 
13.10.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
13.10.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.10.2016Examination requested  [2017/03]
03.02.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
03.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
01.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2014015421  (UNIV HEALTH NETWORK [CA]) [A] 1-9,14,15 * paragraphs [0118] , [ 189] *;
 [A]EP2664359  (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1,9,15 * paragraphs [0014] , [0034] - [0036] *;
 [A]US2009010390  (SAOUDI ABDELHAMID [SA], et al) [A] 1,9 * paragraph [0070]; claims 1,2 *;
 [Y]WO2012063158  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 9-13 * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2012032477  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 9-13 * page 2, line 22 - line 6 * * page 3, line 25 - line 28 * * page 6, line 3 - line 11 * * page 7, line 4 - line 10 * * page 13, line 18 - line 31 *;
 [A]US2011118588  (KOMBLAU GIORA [IL], et al) [A] 1,9,15 * paragraph [0075] *
 [Y]  - DONG WOOK KIM ET AL, "Risk of second cancer from scattered radiation of intensity-modulated radiotherapies with lung cancer", RADIATION ONCOLOGY, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LO, (20130304), vol. 8, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1748-717X-8-47, ISSN 1748-717X, page 47, XP021142544 [Y] 9-13 * figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1748-717X-8-47