Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3107701

EP3107701 - CEMENTITIOUS SLURRY MIXING AND DISPENSING SYSTEM WITH PULSER ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.05.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United States Gypsum Company
550 West Adams Street
Chicago, IL 60661-3676 / US
[2016/52]
Inventor(s)01 / WITTBOLD, James R.
89 Windsor Drive
Des Plaines, Illinois 60018 / US
02 / LEE, Chris C.
1828 Boulder Dr.
Mount Prospect, IL 60056 / US
03 / RAGO, William J.
36240 N. Edgewood Drive
Gurnee, Illinois 60031 / US
 [2016/52]
Representative(s)BSB Patentanwälte Schütte & Engelen Partnerschaft mbB
Am Markt 10
59302 Oelde / DE
[2019/41]
Former [2016/52]BSB Intellectual Property Law
Am Markt 10
59302 Oelde / DE
Application number, filing date15708626.511.02.2015
[2016/52]
WO2015US15305
Priority number, dateUS201461941472P18.02.2014         Original published format: US 201461941472 P
US20141454812719.11.2014         Original published format: US201414548127
[2016/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015126685
Date:27.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3107701
Date:28.12.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015
[2016/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3107701
Date:09.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.08.2015
ClassificationInternational:B28B19/00, B05C5/02
[2016/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MISCH- UND ABGABEVORRICHTUNG FÜR ZEMENTARTIGE AUFSCHLÄMMUNG MIT IMPULSGEBER UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON[2016/52]
English:CEMENTITIOUS SLURRY MIXING AND DISPENSING SYSTEM WITH PULSER ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR USING SAME[2016/52]
French:SYSTÈME DE MÉLANGE ET DE DISTRIBUTION DE COULIS À BASE DE CIMENT COMPRENANT UN ENSEMBLE GÉNÉRATEUR D'IMPULSIONS ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION[2016/52]
Entry into regional phase07.09.2016National basic fee paid 
07.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
07.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.09.2016Examination requested  [2016/52]
07.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
30.08.2019Fee for grant paid
30.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XD]US2013098268  (LI ALFRED [US], et al) [XD] 1-4,14,15 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0060]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0097]; figures 9-13 * * paragraph [0126] *;
 [XD]US2013100759  (WITTBOLD JAMES [US], et al) [XD] 1-4,14,15 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0094]; figures 7-12 *
by applicantUS5320677
 US3359146
 US5683635
 US5643510
 US6494609
 US6874930
 US7007914
 US7296919
 US2004231916
 US6342284
 US6632550
 US6800131
 US5714001
 US6774146
 US2002045074
 US2005019618
 US2006035112
 US2007022913
 US2013308411
 US2012168527
 US2012170403
 US2013098268
 US2013099027
 US2013099418
 US2013100759
 US2013216717
 US2013233880