Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3127190

EP3127190 - CONFIGURABLE ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.01.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 16
32758 Detmold / DE
[2017/06]
Inventor(s)01 / HENKE, Ralf
Vochemer Str. 30
50321 Brühl / DE
02 / DIEKMANN, Torsten
Rebhuhnweg 4
33618 Leopoldshöhe / DE
03 / DIEKMANN, Jörg
Im Stillen Winkel 25
33813 Oerlinghausen / DE
04 / MEIER, Jan
Hohe Str. 2
32756 Detmold / DE
 [2017/06]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/06]
Application number, filing date15710499.318.03.2015
[2017/06]
WO2015EP55633
Priority number, dateDE201420101581U03.04.2014         Original published format: DE 202014101581 U
[2017/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015150075
Date:08.10.2015
Language:DE
[2015/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3127190
Date:08.02.2017
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2015
[2017/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:H01R9/26
[2017/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/06]
TitleGerman:KONFIGURIERBARE ELEKTRISCHE STECKANORDNUNG[2017/06]
English:CONFIGURABLE ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY[2017/06]
French:SYSTÈME D'ENFICHAGE ÉLECTRIQUE CONFIGURABLE[2017/06]
Entry into regional phase12.09.2016National basic fee paid 
12.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
12.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/06]
12.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
09.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE202005003820U  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-9,11,13 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0022] , [0025] * * figures 1, 3, 5 * [Y] 2,10,12,14;
 [Y]DE29606007U  (HARTMANN & BRAUN AG [DE]) [Y] 2,10,12,14 * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 14 * * figure 1 *;
 [IY]EP2626879  (AMPHENOL AIR LB [FR]) [I] 1,2 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] * * figures 1-6 * [Y] 12,14;
 [IA]DE10216159  (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]) [I] 1,2 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0064] * * abstract * [A] 3-14