Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3126757

EP3126757 - CONTAINER TREATMENT INSTALLATION WITH REFRIGERATION INSTALLATION, AND METHOD FOR STARTING THE OPERATION OF A REFRIGERATION INSTALLATION OF A CONTAINER TREATMENT INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Krones AG
Böhmerwaldstraße 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
[2017/06]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHNEIDER, Juergen
Böhmerwaldstraße 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
 [2017/06]
Representative(s)Schuhbießer, Irmgard Gertrud
Schuhbießer-Patent
Holzgartenstraße 6
93059 Regensburg / DE
[2017/06]
Application number, filing date15710726.924.02.2015
[2017/06]
WO2015EP53842
Priority number, dateDE20141010470902.04.2014         Original published format: DE102014104709
[2017/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015149997
Date:08.10.2015
Language:DE
[2015/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3126757
Date:08.02.2017
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2015
[2017/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:F25B45/00, B67C3/00
[2017/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/06]
TitleGerman:BEHÄLTERBEHANDLUNGSANLAGE MIT KÄLTEANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR INBETRIEBNAHME EINER KÄLTEANLAGE EINER BEHÄLTERBEHANDLUNGSANLAGE[2017/06]
English:CONTAINER TREATMENT INSTALLATION WITH REFRIGERATION INSTALLATION, AND METHOD FOR STARTING THE OPERATION OF A REFRIGERATION INSTALLATION OF A CONTAINER TREATMENT INSTALLATION[2017/06]
French:INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT DE RÉCIPIENTS MUNIE D'UN SYSTÈME FRIGORIFIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN SERVICE D'UN SYSTÈME FRIGORIFIQUE D'UNE INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT DE RÉCIPIENTS[2017/06]
Entry into regional phase23.09.2016National basic fee paid 
23.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.08.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/06]
19.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XAI]WO2008066530  (CARRIER CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0022]; figure 1 * [A] 9,10 [I] 4-6;
 [XAI]US4507931  (BARROW BILLY E [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8 * column 2, line 59 - column 7, line 36; figure 1 * [A] 9,10 [I] 4-6;
 [XAI]DE102004023419  (KRONES AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * paragraphs [0001] - [0010] - [0032] - [0035]; figure 3 * [A] 9,10 [I] 4-6