Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3116523 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3116523



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 802
21.08.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
29.10.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
20.09.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.09.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
06.09.2018 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
06.09.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
06.09.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 79
06.09.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 79
06.09.2018 Text intended for grant (sequence listing) Search / examination 2
31.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
31.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
31.07.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 1
31.07.2018 Claims Search / examination 7
31.07.2018 Description Search / examination 1
31.07.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 8
31.07.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 8
31.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
31.07.2018 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
21.03.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
21.03.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
21.03.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
21.03.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 79
21.03.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 79
21.03.2018 Text intended for grant (sequence listing) Search / examination 2
20.02.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.02.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
22.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.01.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
30.11.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
20.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.11.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.07.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
14.07.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.07.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
31.05.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
10.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.05.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 7
10.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 19
10.05.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
10.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.05.2017 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
10.05.2017 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 4
27.02.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.02.2017 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
30.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.01.2017 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
22.12.2016 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
21.12.2016 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.12.2016 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
15.12.2016 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
12.12.2016 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
09.12.2016 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
06.12.2016 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
07.11.2016 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
25.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.10.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
27.09.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
22.07.2016 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
05.10.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 64
05.10.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 39
17.09.2015 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 2
17.09.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
17.09.2015 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 91
14.08.2015 Annex International Searching Authority 2
14.08.2015 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 1
14.08.2015 Substitute sheet (Rule 26) - drawings for ISA/EP International Searching Authority 23
14.08.2015 Substitute sheet (Rule 26) - drawings for ISA/EP International Searching Authority 3
27.05.2015 Annex International Searching Authority 2
22.05.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
22.05.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
22.05.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
19.03.2015 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
19.03.2015 Annex International Searching Authority 3
19.03.2015 Annex International Searching Authority 1
19.03.2015 Claims International Searching Authority 17
19.03.2015 Description International Searching Authority 49
19.03.2015 Drawings International Searching Authority 23