Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3116524 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3116524



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 722
02.10.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.12.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
02.11.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.10.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.10.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 8
10.10.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 7
10.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
31.05.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
31.05.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
31.05.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
31.05.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 80
31.05.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 79
20.02.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.02.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
23.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
23.01.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
23.01.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 51
23.01.2018 Claims Search / examination 6
23.01.2018 Description Search / examination 49
23.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.01.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.11.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
20.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.11.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.07.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
13.07.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.07.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
31.05.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
10.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.05.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
10.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 20
10.05.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
10.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.05.2017 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 4
10.05.2017 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
30.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.01.2017 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 2
21.12.2016 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.12.2016 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
09.12.2016 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
09.12.2016 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
09.12.2016 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
06.12.2016 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
02.12.2016 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
10.11.2016 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
25.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.10.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
27.09.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
22.07.2016 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
05.10.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 65
05.10.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 39
17.09.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
17.09.2015 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 92
17.09.2015 Sequence listing Search / examination 1
20.08.2015 Annex International Searching Authority 2
20.08.2015 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 1
20.08.2015 Substitute sheet (Rule 26) - drawings for ISA/EP International Searching Authority 23
10.06.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
10.06.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
10.06.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
23.03.2015 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
23.03.2015 Annex International Searching Authority 1
23.03.2015 Annex International Searching Authority 3
23.03.2015 Claims International Searching Authority 18
23.03.2015 Description International Searching Authority 50
23.03.2015 Drawings International Searching Authority 23