Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3128955

EP3128955 - PROSTHESIS WITH FIXED OR MOBILE BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.03.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.10.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.01.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet UK Healthcare Limited
Waterton Industrial Estate
Bridgend
South Wales CF31 3XA / GB
For all designated states
Dodd, Christopher Alexander Ferrier
1 Tackley Place
Oxford, Oxfordshire OX2 6RR / GB
For all designated states
Murray, David Wycliffe
Cuddesdon House
Cuddesdon
Oxford OX44 9HB / GB
For all designated states
O'Connor, John Joseph
Quarry Manor
9 Beaumont Road
Headington
Oxford, Oxfordshire OX3 8JN / GB
[2017/07]
Inventor(s)01 / DODD, Christopher Alexander Ferrier
1 Tackley Place
Oxford Oxfordshire OX2 6RR / GB
02 / MURRAY, David Wycliffe
Cuddesdon House
Cuddesdon
Oxford Oxfordshire OX44 9HB / GB
03 / O'CONNOR, John Joseph
Quarry Manor
9 Beaumont Road
Headington
Oxford Oxfordshire OX3 8JN / GB
04 / LLOYD, Russell
73 Sedgebrook Road
Liden
Swindon Wiltshire SN3 6EZ / GB
 [2017/07]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2017/07]
Application number, filing date15713805.827.03.2015
[2017/07]
WO2015GB50931
Priority number, dateGB2014000656511.04.2014         Original published format: GB 201406565
[2017/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015155505
Date:15.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3128955
Date:15.02.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2015
[2017/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3128955
Date:25.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/38
[2017/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:PROTHESE MIT FESTEM ODER BEWEGLICHEM LAGER[2017/07]
English:PROSTHESIS WITH FIXED OR MOBILE BEARING[2017/07]
French:PROTHÈSE À PLATEAU FIXE OU MOBILE[2017/07]
Entry into regional phase10.11.2016National basic fee paid 
10.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
10.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/07]
10.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2018Fee for grant paid
26.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)28.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
IT25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SI25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/11]AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
IT25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
SM25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT25.04.2018
CZ25.04.2018
DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RO25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
SK25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK25.04.2018
EE25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK25.04.2018
ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2019/03]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
PT27.08.2018
Former [2018/52]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
GR26.07.2018
Former [2018/51]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
LV25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
RS25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/50]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
HR25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/49]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
PL25.04.2018
SE25.04.2018
BG25.07.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/47]ES25.04.2018
FI25.04.2018
LT25.04.2018
NL25.04.2018
NO25.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL25.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]US2010222890  (BARNETT GARY D [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3-8,11-13,16-18,44,47,48 * paragraph [0170] - paragraph [0173] * * figure 14 *;
 [XA]US2013325137  (TRIMMER KENNETH [US]) [X] 22-30,32,33,37,38,40-43 * abstract * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0032] * * figures 1,9 * [A] 1,44,47,48;
 [XA]US2003195634  (FENNING JOHN B [US] ET AL) [X] 22,24-26,33-37,39,40,42 * paragraph [0037] * * figures 1,6A * [A] 1,44,47,48;
 [X]EP0529408  (AESCULAP AG [DE]) [X] 22,24-26,33,37,39,40 * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 18 * * figure - *;
 [A]WO2013046170  (OOSTHUIZEN CHRISTIAAN RUDOLF [ZA]) [A] 1,44,47,48 * page 13, line 1 - line 15 * * figures 3,4 *