Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3122331

EP3122331 - SPRAY-DRIED SOLID-IN-OIL-IN-WATER DISPERSIONS FOR INHALATION OF ACTIVE PHARMACEUTICAL INGREDIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.04.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.12.2016
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  31.10.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip12.08.2019Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[2017/05]
Inventor(s)01 / HUANG, Daniel
c/o Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
150 Industrial Road
San Carlos, California 94070 / US
02 / RAO, Nagaraja
c/o Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
150 Industrial Road
San Carlos, California 94070 / US
03 / TAN, Trixie
c/o Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
150 Industrial Road
San Carlos, California 94070 / US
04 / MILLER, Danforth
c/o Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
150 Industrial Road
San Carlos, California 94070 / US
05 / WEERS, Jeffry
c/o Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
150 Industrial Road
San Carlos, California 94070 / US
 [2017/05]
Representative(s)Stierwald, Michael
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2017/05]Hassenbürger, Anneliese
Novartis Pharma AG
Postfach
4002 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date15714036.924.03.2015
[2017/05]
WO2015IB52151
Priority number, dateUS201461971232P27.03.2014         Original published format: US 201461971232 P
[2017/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015145353
Date:01.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3122331
Date:01.02.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2015
[2017/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/00
[2017/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/05]
TitleGerman:SPRÜHGETROCKNETE FESTSTOFF-IN-ÖL-IN-WASSER-DISPERSIONEN ZUR INHALATION AKTIVER PHARMAZEUTISCHER INHALTSSTOFFE[2017/05]
English:SPRAY-DRIED SOLID-IN-OIL-IN-WATER DISPERSIONS FOR INHALATION OF ACTIVE PHARMACEUTICAL INGREDIENTS[2017/05]
French:DISPERSIONS D'HUILE-DANS-L'EAU SOLIDES SÉCHÉES PAR PULVÉRISATION POUR L'INHALATION DE PRINCIPES PHARMACEUTIQUES ACTIFS[2017/05]
Entry into regional phase27.10.2016National basic fee paid 
27.10.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
27.10.2016Examination requested  [2017/05]
18.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2012106575  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 19-28 * example 2 * [I] 1-19;
 [XI]WO0185136  (ALLIANCE PHARMA [US]) [X] 19-27 * example 3 * [I] 1-18,28
by applicantUS8318935
 WO0075114
 WO2005123684
 US4472393
 US5889015
 US6057307
 US6057581
 US6677322
 US6677323
 US6365581
 US3991761
 US8479730
 US8069851
 US7559325
 US8573197