EP3134101 - USE OF BOUGAINVILLEA PLANT CELLS FOR ENCAPSULATING ACTIVE INGREDIENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société De Recherche Cosmétique S.à.r.L. 4 Place de Paris 2314 Luxembourg / LU | [2017/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LECLERE, Jacques 70 route de Sully F-45500 Saint-Gondon / FR | 02 /
ENNAMANY, Rachid 34 rue d'Audenge F-33000 Bordeaux / FR | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | Peguet, Wilfried, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63 avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/09] | Peguet, Wilfried, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | Application number, filing date | 15715311.5 | 16.04.2015 | [2017/09] | WO2015EP58241 | Priority number, date | FR20140053647 | 23.04.2014 Original published format: FR 1453647 | [2017/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015162052 | Date: | 29.10.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3134101 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3134101 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/36, A61K36/88, A61K8/14, A61Q19/00 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
A61K36/36 (EP,US);
A61K36/88 (EP);
A61K8/14 (EP);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61K8/9794 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
A61K2800/10 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP);
A61Q19/06 (EP);
A61Q19/08 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON BOUGAINVILLEA-PFLANZENZELLEN ZUM EINKAPSELN VON AKTIVEN INHALTSSTOFFEN | [2017/09] | English: | USE OF BOUGAINVILLEA PLANT CELLS FOR ENCAPSULATING ACTIVE INGREDIENTS | [2017/09] | French: | UTILISATION DE CELLULES VEGETALES DE BOUGAINVILLIER POUR L'ENCAPSULATION D'INGREDIENTS ACTIFS | [2017/09] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 10.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.04.2015 | AL | 06.06.2018 | AT | 06.06.2018 | CY | 06.06.2018 | CZ | 06.06.2018 | DK | 06.06.2018 | EE | 06.06.2018 | FI | 06.06.2018 | HR | 06.06.2018 | LT | 06.06.2018 | LV | 06.06.2018 | MC | 06.06.2018 | MK | 06.06.2018 | MT | 06.06.2018 | NL | 06.06.2018 | PL | 06.06.2018 | RO | 06.06.2018 | RS | 06.06.2018 | SE | 06.06.2018 | SI | 06.06.2018 | SK | 06.06.2018 | SM | 06.06.2018 | TR | 06.06.2018 | BG | 06.09.2018 | NO | 06.09.2018 | GR | 07.09.2018 | IS | 06.10.2018 | PT | 08.10.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 16.04.2015 | |
AL | 06.06.2018 | ||
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
MT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 16.04.2015 | |
AL | 06.06.2018 | ||
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
PT | 08.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
TR | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
MC | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.06.2018 | |
AT | 06.06.2018 | ||
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
DK | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SI | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
SM | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 06.06.2018 | |
CY | 06.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 06.06.2018 | ||
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
PL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RO | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
SK | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
EE | 06.06.2018 | ||
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
IS | 06.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
NL | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
GR | 07.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
LV | 06.06.2018 | ||
RS | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
HR | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 06.06.2018 | |
FI | 06.06.2018 | ||
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
SE | 06.06.2018 | ||
BG | 06.09.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 06.06.2018 | |
LT | 06.06.2018 | ||
NO | 06.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1310262 (AVON PROD INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraphs [0025] , [0028]; claims 1-24 *; | [A]WO2004082643 (SHISEIDO INT FRANCE [FR], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 1, lines 8-11; claims 1-39 * * page 3, lines 19-20 * * page 5, line 13 * * page 13, line 21 - page 14, line 23 *; | [A]EP1985280 (MIBELLE AG [CH]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2949975 (SOLUCOS [FR]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A] - CHEN N ET AL, "Hyaluronic acid production promoter for use in topical preparation or cosmetics for moisturizing skin and preventing aging, contains plants e.g. Solena amplexicaulis, Laggera alata and/or Kalimeris indica, or its extract", WPI / THOMSON,, (20070405), vol. 2007, no. 30, XP002733987 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - CORNELIA SCHÜRCH ET AL, "Potential of plant cells in culture for cosmetic application", PHYTOCHEMISTRY REVIEWS, (20071201), vol. 7, no. 3, doi:10.1007/s11101-007-9082-0, ISSN 1568-7767, pages 599 - 605, XP055043814 [A] 1-16 * page 601, column r, paragraph 3 - page 602, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11101-007-9082-0 | [A] - CHANCHAL DEEP ET AL, "Novel approaches in herbal cosmetics.", JOURNAL OF COSMETIC DERMATOLOGY JUN 2008, (200806), vol. 7, no. 2, ISSN 1473-2165, pages 89 - 95, XP002734351 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1473-2165.2008.00369.x |