Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3146702

EP3146702 - ENHANCED CALL RECORDING FOR DUAL-SIM DUAL-ACTIVE WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 12.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.08.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.02.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.06.2019  [2019/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2017/13]
Inventor(s)01 / KOTREKA, Ravi Kanth
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / KADIYALA, Pavan Kumar
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / KARRA, Ramlal
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/13]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/13]
Application number, filing date15716628.125.03.2015
[2017/13]
WO2015US22400
Priority number, dateUS20141428151119.05.2014         Original published format: US201414281511
[2017/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015179018
Date:26.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3146702
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2015
[2017/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/656
[2017/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/13]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE ANRUFAUFZEICHNUNG FÜR DRAHTLOSE DUAL-SIM-DUAL-AKTIVE KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNGEN[2017/13]
English:ENHANCED CALL RECORDING FOR DUAL-SIM DUAL-ACTIVE WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICES[2017/13]
French:ENREGISTREMENT D'APPEL AMÉLIORÉ POUR DES DISPOSITIFS DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL À DOUBLE CARTE SIM ET DOUBLE ACTIVATION[2017/13]
Entry into regional phase24.10.2016National basic fee paid 
24.10.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
24.10.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.03.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.10.2016Examination requested  [2017/13]
24.10.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/25]
31.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2019/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201905   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2014038666  (CHIN TOM [US] ET AL) [X] 1-28 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0043] *;
 [I]US2006234693  (ISIDORE E P; WARNER N E) [I] 1-28 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0091] *