Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3108639

EP3108639 - TRANSPORT ACCELERATOR IMPLEMENTING EXTENDED TRANSMISSION CONTROL FUNCTIONALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.10.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.02.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/52]
Inventor(s)01 / MAO, Yinian
Qualcomm Incorporated
Attn: International IP Administration
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
02 / ULUPINAR, Fatih
Qualcomm Incorporated
Attn: International IP Administration
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
03 / LUBY, Michael George
Qualcomm Incorporated
Attn: International IP Administration
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
04 / MINDER, Lorenz Christoph
Qualcomm Incorporated
Attn: International IP Administration
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/52]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2016/52]
Application number, filing date15717290.916.03.2015
[2016/52]
WO2015US20791
Priority number, dateUS201461954936P18.03.2014         Original published format: US 201461954936 P
US20141428918128.05.2014         Original published format: US201414289181
[2016/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015142748
Date:24.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3108639
Date:28.12.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2015
[2016/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3108639
Date:18.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.09.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08, H04L29/06, H04L29/14
[2017/41]
Former International [2016/52]H04L29/06, H04L29/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRANSPORTBESCHLEUNIGER MIT ERWEITERTER GETRIEBESTEUERUNGSFUNKTION[2016/52]
English:TRANSPORT ACCELERATOR IMPLEMENTING EXTENDED TRANSMISSION CONTROL FUNCTIONALITY[2016/52]
French:ACCÉLÉRATEUR DE TRANSPORT METTANT EN OEUVRE UNE FONCTIONNALITÉ DE COMMANDE DE TRANSMISSION ÉTENDUE[2016/52]
Entry into regional phase22.09.2016National basic fee paid 
22.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
22.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.01.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.09.2016Examination requested  [2016/52]
22.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.02.2018Fee for grant paid
13.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)21.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
[2019/46]
Former [2019/26]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2019/11]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
IT18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2019/10]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2019/09]AL18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AL18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2018/52]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL18.04.2018
ES18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL18.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[I]US2014032987  (NAGARAJ THADI M [US], et al) [I] 1-23 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraphs [0021] , [0024] - [0025] - [0027] - [0029] * * paragraphs [0047] , [0 81] - [0083] - [0 87] - [0088] *;
 [A]US2013227080  (GAO QIANG [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2010111261  (AZUKI SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * page 11, line 2 - page 12, line 6 *
ExaminationUS2012271880