Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3137515

EP3137515 - METHODS FOR CONTROLLING ALUMINUM ALKYL FEED TO A SLURRY POLYMERIZATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.12.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.02.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2019Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Brühler Strasse 60
50389 Wesseling / DE
[2017/10]
Inventor(s)01 / KUEHL, Reinhard
Teutonenstrasse 30
53332 Bornheim / DE
02 / CARVAJAL, Rodrigo
Scharnhorststrasse 1
53175 Bonn / DE
03 / MEIER, Gerhardus
46 Blooming Grove Ln
Houston, TX 77077-1928 / US
04 / DAMM, Elke
Hans Kudlichstrasse 3
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
05 / PYMAN, Phil
Herzog Adolfstrasse 1
65812 Bad Soden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/10]01 / KUEHL, Reinhard
Teutonenstrasse 30
53332 Bornheim / DE
02 / CARVAJAL, Rodrigo
Scharnhorststrasse 1
53175 Bonn / DE
03 / MEIER, Gerhardus
Eichendorffstrasse 3
60320 Frankfurt / DE
04 / DAMM, Elke
Hans Kudlichstrasse 3
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
05 / PYMAN, Phil
Herzog Adolfstrasse 1
65812 Bad Soden / DE
Representative(s)Seelert, Stefan , et al
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Intellectual Property
Bldg. E413, 5.OG
Industriepark Hoechst
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/10]Seelert, Stefan
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Intellectual Property
Bldg. B852, 5th floor
Industriepark Hoechst
65926 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date15718498.728.04.2015
[2017/10]
WO2015EP59119
Priority number, dateEP2014016621928.04.2014         Original published format: EP 14166219
[2017/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015165861
Date:05.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3137515
Date:08.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2015
[2017/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:C08F10/02, C08F2/14
[2017/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/10]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR REGULIERUNG EINER ALUMINIUMALKYLZUFUHR AN EIN SCHLAMMPOLYMERISIERUNGSVERFAHREN[2017/10]
English:METHODS FOR CONTROLLING ALUMINUM ALKYL FEED TO A SLURRY POLYMERIZATION PROCESS[2017/10]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE COMMANDE D'ALIMENTATION D'UN ALKYLE D'ALUMINIUM POUR UN PROCÉDÉ DE POLYMÉRISATION EN SUSPENSION[2019/33]
Former [2017/10]PROCÉDÉS DE RÉGULATION D'UNE ALIMENTATION D'ALKYLALUMINIUM AU NIVEAU D'UN PROCÉDÉ DE POLYMÉRISATION EN SUSPENSION
Entry into regional phase15.09.2016National basic fee paid 
15.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.2015Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/10]
15.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
31.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.12.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
09.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
08.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[I]WO9952952  (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al) [I] 1-13 * page 1, lines 10-15 * * page 2, lines 19-21 * * page 5, lines 26-28 * * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 15 * * table 1 * * figure 1 *