Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3143806

EP3143806 - REPORTING DEVICE STATISTICS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.05.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.02.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2017/12]
Inventor(s)01 / GRIOT, Miguel
5775 Morehouse Road
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / ZISIMOPOULOS, Haris
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / WANG, Jun
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/12]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/12]
Application number, filing date15718675.031.03.2015
[2017/12]
WO2015US23684
Priority number, dateUS201461992067P12.05.2014         Original published format: US 201461992067 P
US20151467350830.03.2015         Original published format: US201514673508
[2017/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015175101
Date:19.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3143806
Date:22.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2015
[2017/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/08, H04W72/04, H04W72/08, H04W76/27, H04W52/02, // H04W88/18, H04W92/12
[2019/19]
Former International [2017/12]H04W52/02, H04W76/06, H04W92/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/12]
TitleGerman:MELDUNG VON VORRICHTUNGSSTATISTIKEN IN DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONEN[2017/12]
English:REPORTING DEVICE STATISTICS IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS[2017/12]
French:CRÉATION DE RAPPORT DE STATISTIQUES DE DISPOSITIF DANS DES COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL[2019/24]
Former [2017/12]CRÉATION RAPPORT DE STATISTIQUES DE DISPOSITIF DANS DES COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL
Entry into regional phase28.09.2016National basic fee paid 
28.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/12]
28.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
08.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]  - ZTE, "CN Assistance information for eNB parameters tuning", vol. RAN WG3, no. San Jose del Cabo, Mexico; 20140331 - 20140404, (20140330), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-140746 CN ASSISTANCE INFORMATION FOR ENB PARAMTERERS TUNING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CED, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN3/Docs/, (20140330), XP050795437 [A] 1-30 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 2] *
 [A]  - ALCATEL-LUCENT SHANGHAI BELL ET AL, "Details of Assistance Information in SDDTE", vol. RAN WG3, no. San Jose del Cabo, Mexico; 20140331 - 20140404, (20140330), 3GPP DRAFT; R3-140777_ASSISTANCESDTTE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN3/Docs/, (20140330), XP050795467 [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [02.2] *
 [A]  - NSN ET AL, "Evaluation on CN Assistance Informationfor SDDTE", vol. RAN WG2, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20140210 - 20140214, (20140209), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-140653 (CN_ASSISTANCE_ANALYSIS), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20140209), XP050791962 [A] 1-30 * paragraph [02.1] *
 [XP]  - QUALCOMM ET AL, "CN Assistance information for eNB parameters setting", vol. SA WG2, no. Phoenix, Arizona, USA, (20140526), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-142262 S2_103_CN ASSIST CR TO 23.401, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/TSGS2_103_Phoenix/Docs/, (20140526), XP050836685 [XP] 1,11,21,26 * paragraph [4.3.21.1] *