Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3116896 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3116896



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 780
23.10.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
03.01.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
22.11.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.10.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
29.10.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
29.10.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
29.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
30.07.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
30.07.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
30.07.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
30.07.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 102
30.07.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 102
30.07.2018 Text intended for grant (sequence listing) Search / examination 1
29.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
29.06.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
29.06.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 51
29.06.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
29.06.2018 Description Search / examination 47
29.06.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
29.06.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.04.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
05.04.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
28.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
28.02.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 50
28.02.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
28.02.2018 Description Search / examination 48
28.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
28.02.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.12.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
11.12.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
23.11.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
23.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
23.11.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
13.07.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
13.07.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.07.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
02.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.05.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
02.05.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
02.05.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
02.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
21.12.2016 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
25.10.2016 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
18.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.10.2016 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 1
07.10.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
27.09.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
30.08.2016 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
30.08.2016 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
30.08.2016 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
30.08.2016 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
22.07.2016 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
17.11.2015 Annex International Searching Authority 2
17.11.2015 Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 2
05.10.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 39
17.09.2015 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 1
17.09.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
17.09.2015 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 107
17.07.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
17.07.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
17.07.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
22.06.2015 Annex International Searching Authority 2
10.06.2015 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
10.06.2015 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
08.05.2015 Annex International Searching Authority 2
23.04.2015 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
23.04.2015 Annex International Searching Authority 3
23.04.2015 Annex International Searching Authority 2
23.04.2015 Claims International Searching Authority 3
23.04.2015 Description International Searching Authority 50
23.04.2015 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
23.04.2015 Drawings International Searching Authority 48