Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3157395

EP3157395 - SINGLE SERVE BREWING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.10.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.03.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020  [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tentorio, Massimo
Via Verdi Nr. 11
23848 Ello (Lecco) / IT
[2017/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2017/17]
Representative(s)Giannini, Manuela , et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[2017/17]
Application number, filing date15720799.421.04.2015
[2017/17]
WO2015IB52914
Priority number, dateUS201462014550P19.06.2014         Original published format: US 201462014550 P
[2017/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015193744
Date:23.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3157395
Date:26.04.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2015
[2017/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3157395
Date:11.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:A47J31/36
[2017/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:BRÜHMASCHINE FÜR EINZELPORTIONEN[2017/17]
English:SINGLE SERVE BREWING MACHINE[2017/17]
French:MACHINE DE BRASSAGE À USAGE UNIQUE[2017/17]
Entry into regional phase13.12.2016National basic fee paid 
13.12.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/17]
13.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.03.2018Fee for grant paid
02.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)14.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
IE21.04.2018
LU21.04.2018
MT21.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/35]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
ES11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
IE21.04.2018
LU21.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SI11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
IE21.04.2018
LU21.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/19]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
IE21.04.2018
LU21.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
IT11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
SM11.04.2018
LU21.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL11.04.2018
AT11.04.2018
CZ11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
MC11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RO11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
SK11.04.2018
LU21.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
EE11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
LU21.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL11.04.2018
DK11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
LU21.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
PT13.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
GR12.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
LV11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
RS11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
HR11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
PL11.04.2018
SE11.04.2018
BG11.07.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL11.04.2018
FI11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL11.04.2018
LT11.04.2018
NL11.04.2018
NO11.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL11.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1541070  (INVENTOS PARA SIST S VENDING S [ES]) [X] 1-3,5,10,11,13,24 * figure 1 *;
 [X]EP2447648  (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [X] 1-3,5,10,11,13,24 * figure 4 *;
 [A]FR2842090  (SEB SA [FR]) [A] 1,10 * figure 2 *
by applicantUS5325765
    - AN OVERVIEW OF RESEARCH ON THE POTENTIAL HEALTH BENEFITS OF TEA, URL: http://www.teausa.com/teausa/images/TeaCouncil-ResearchDocR5 FINAL.pdf
    - SU X; DUAN J; JIANG Y; DUAN X; CHEN F, "Polyphenolic Profile and Antioxidant Activities of Oolong Tea Infusion under Various Steeping Conditions", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR SCIENCES, (2007), vol. 8, no. 12, pages 1196 - 1205