Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3138267

EP3138267 - PROVIDING LOCATION INFORMATION FOR EXPRESSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.01.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.02.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.09.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.02.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
Attn: International IP Administration
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2017/42]
Former [2017/10]For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
Inventor(s)01 / STEPHENS, Arthur
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / VANDERVEEN, Michaela
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / PARK, Vincent Douglas
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/10]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/10]
Application number, filing date15721058.427.03.2015
[2017/10]
WO2015US22949
Priority number, dateUS20141426490429.04.2014         Original published format: US201414264904
[2017/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015167717
Date:05.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3138267
Date:08.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2015
[2017/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3138267
Date:21.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08, H04W4/02, H04W4/20
[2017/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/10]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:BEREITSTELLUNG VON POSITIONSINFORMATIONEN FÜR EXPRESSIONEN[2017/10]
English:PROVIDING LOCATION INFORMATION FOR EXPRESSIONS[2017/10]
French:FOURNITURE D'INFORMATIONS DE POSITION À DES FINS D'EXPRESSIONS[2017/10]
Entry into regional phase27.09.2016National basic fee paid 
27.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.02.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/10]
27.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
25.01.2018Fee for grant paid
25.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.02.2018Information about intention to grant a patent
09.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)02.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
IT21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SI21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
IE27.03.2018
LU27.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/12]AL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
IT21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
IE27.03.2018
LU27.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
IT21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
IE27.03.2018
LU27.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2019/06]AL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
IT21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
LU27.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2019/04]AL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
IT21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
LU27.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2019/03]AL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
IT21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
PT23.07.2018
Former [2018/52]AL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
IT21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/50]AL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
IT21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/49]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
IT21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/47]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
ES21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
IT21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/46]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/45]CY21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
NL21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/40]CY21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SE21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/37]CY21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
NO21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/35]CY21.03.2018
FI21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
NO21.06.2018
Cited inInternational search[IA]WO2013112953  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [I] 1-8,14-19,24-27 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0044] * [A] 9-13,20-23,28-30;
 [A]WO2009048740  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-30 * abstract * * page 10, line 20 - line 24 *
 [A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Study on architecture enhancements to support Proximity-based Services (ProSe) (Release 12)", (20140310), 3GPP DRAFT; 23703-C00, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/Latest_SA2_Specs/Rel-12/, (20140310), XP050835340 [A] 1-30 * abstract * * page 269 *