Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3141018

EP3141018 - SMALL CELL ACTIVATION CONTROL OF PORTABLE MULTI-PURPOSE WIRELESS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2017/11]
Inventor(s)01 / DAS, Soumya
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
02 / PARK, Edwin Chongwoo
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
03 / SONG, Bongyong
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/11]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/11]
Application number, filing date15721079.020.04.2015
[2017/11]
WO2015US26631
Priority number, dateUS20141427114706.05.2014         Original published format: US201414271147
[2017/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015171294
Date:12.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3141018
Date:15.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2015
[2017/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/02, H04W52/02, H04W64/00, H04W84/04
[2017/11]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/11]
TitleGerman:STEUERUNG VON KLEINZELLENAKTIVIERUNG EINER TRAGBAREN DRAHTLOSEN MEHRZWECKVORRICHTUNG[2017/11]
English:SMALL CELL ACTIVATION CONTROL OF PORTABLE MULTI-PURPOSE WIRELESS DEVICE[2017/11]
French:COMMANDE D'ACTIVATION DE PETITE CELLULE DE DISPOSITIF SANS FIL PORTATIF À USAGES MULTIPLES[2017/11]
Entry into regional phase28.09.2016National basic fee paid 
28.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/11]
28.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
09.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
08.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2013060384  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-9,12-23,26-30 * abstract * * page 8, lines 12-22 * * page 8, line 24 - page 9, line 19 * * page 9, lines 21-29 * * page 10, lines 18-25 * * page 11, lines 10-20 * * page 12, lines 7-11 * * page 12, line 35 - page 13, line 27 * * page 13, lines 19-27 * * page 17, lines 4-34 * * page 23, lines 1-12 * * figures 1,3 * [I] 10,11,24,25;
 [XI]US2010056184  (VAKIL FARAMAK [US], et al) [X] 1,15,29,30 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0069] * * figures 1-3 * [I] 2-14,16-28;
 [XI]US2009285143  (KWUN JONG-HYUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1,15,29,30 * abstract * * paragraphs [0041] - [0092] * * figures 1-6 * [I] 2-14,16-28;
 [XI]EP2416609  (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [X] 1,15,29,30 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0049] * * figures 1-4,6-8 * [I] 2-14,16-28