Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3134514

EP3134514 - METHODS FOR ISOLATING, CULTURING, AND GENETICALLY ENGINEERING IMMUNE CELL POPULATIONS FOR ADOPTIVE THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.04.2019
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.12.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.01.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Juno Therapeutics, Inc.
307 Westlake Avenue North
Suite 300
Seattle, WA 98109 / US
[2017/09]
Inventor(s)01 / RAMSBORG, Chris
307 Westlake Avenue North
Suite 300
Seattle, WA 98109 / US
02 / BONYHADI, Mark, L.
307 Westlake Avenue North
Suite 300
Seattle, WA 98109 / US
03 / CHAN, Calvin
307 Westlake Avenue North
Suite 300
Seattle, WA 98109 / US
04 / BEAUCHESNE, Pascal
307 Westlake Avenue North
Suite 300
Seattle, WA 98109 / US
 [2017/09]
Representative(s)Goodfellow, Hugh Robin , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/09]Salisbury, Frances , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
Application number, filing date15721094.923.04.2015
[2017/09]
WO2015US27401
Priority number, dateUS201461983415P23.04.2014         Original published format: US 201461983415 P
[2017/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015164675
Date:29.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3134514
Date:01.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2015
[2017/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/17, C12M1/00, G01N33/569, A61K35/12, C12N5/0781, C12N5/0783
[2019/15]
Former International [2017/09]C12N5/0781, C12N5/0783
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/09]
Extension statesBA10.11.2016
ME10.11.2016
Validation statesMA10.11.2016
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ISOLIERUNG, KULTIVIERUNG UND GENETISCHEN MANIPULATION VON IMMUNEN ZELLPOPULATIONEN ZUR ADOPTIVEN THERAPIE[2017/09]
English:METHODS FOR ISOLATING, CULTURING, AND GENETICALLY ENGINEERING IMMUNE CELL POPULATIONS FOR ADOPTIVE THERAPY[2017/09]
French:PROCÉDÉS D'ISOLEMENT, DE CULTURE ET DE MANIPULATION GÉNÉTIQUE DE POPULATIONS DE CELLULES IMMUNITAIRES POUR UNE THÉRAPIE ADOPTIVE[2017/09]
Entry into regional phase10.11.2016National basic fee paid 
10.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
10.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.02.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/09]
12.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
15.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2009072003  (MILTENYI BIOTEC GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-41,69-99,116 * figure 3; claims 1-15 *;
 [Y]WO2013011011  (IBA GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-41,69-99,116 * paragraph [0042]; claims 40-52 *;
 [Y]WO2007117602  (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-41,69-99,116 * paragraphs [0052] , [0089] *;
 [Y]WO2013124474  (STAGE CELL THERAPEUTICS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-41,69-99,116 * the whole document *
 [XY]  - CHRISTIAN STEMBERGER ET AL, "Novel Serial Positive Enrichment Technology Enables Clinical Multiparameter Cell Sorting", PLOS ONE, (20120424), vol. 7, no. 4, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0035798, page e35798, XP055043969 [X] 1-3,7-41,69-79,91,92,96-99,116 * the whole document * [Y] 4-6,80-90,93-95

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0035798
by applicantWO2009072003
 US2011003380
 US4452773
 EP0452342
 US4795698
 US5200084
 US6103493
 WO2013011011
 WO2014076277
 US2004082012
 US7482000
 US5506121
 WO02077018
 US7981632
 US2015024411
 WO2010033140
 US6040177
 WO0014257
 US6451995
 US2002131960
 US7446190
 US8252592
 EP2537416
 US2013287748
 WO2013126726
 US5219740
 US6207453
 US2003170238
 US4690915
 US4235871
 US4501728
 US4837028
 US5019369
 US5087616
    - TERAKURA ET AL., BLOOD, (2012), vol. 1, pages 72 - 82
    - WANG ET AL., JIMMUNOTHER., (2012), vol. 35, no. 9, pages 689 - 701
    - S. A. BROOKS AND U. SCHUMACHER, Methods in Molecular Medicine, vol. 58: Metastasis Research Protocols, Vol. 2: Cell Behavior In Vitro and In Vivo, HUMANA PRESS INC., vol. 58, pages 17 - 25
    - BES ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, pages 14265 - 14273
    - STEMBERGET ET AL., PLOS ONE, vol. 7, page 35798
    - RICH ET AL., ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 386, pages 194 - 216
    - WILSON ET AL., PROC.NATL.ACAD.SCI.USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 3750 - 3755
    - AMADORI, A ET AL., NATURE MED., (1995), vol. 1, pages 1279 - 1283
    - CHAKRAVARTI, A., NATURE MED., (1995), vol. 1, pages 1240 - 1241
    - CLEMENTI, M. ET AL., HUM. GENET., (1999), vol. 105, pages 337 - 342
    - MUHONEN, T., J IMMUNOTHER EMPHASIS TUMORLMMUNOL., (199401), vol. 15, no. 1, pages 67 - 73
    - FOULDS ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 168, no. 4, pages 1528 - 1532
    - CAGGIARI ET AL., CYTOMETRY, (2001), vol. 46, no. 4, pages 233 - 237
    - HOFFMAN ET AL., TRANSPLANTATION, (2002), vol. 74, no. 6, pages 836 - 845
    - KLEBANOFF ET AL., JLMMUNOTHER, (2012), vol. 35, no. 9, pages 651 - 660
    - WANG ET AL., JLMMUNOTHER., (2012), vol. 35, no. 9, pages 689 - 701
    - CHO ET AL., LAB CHIP, (2010), vol. 10, pages 1567 - 1573
    - GODIN ET AL., J BIOPHOTON., (2008), vol. 1, no. 5, pages 355 - 376
    - MALDONADO, ARTHRITIS RES THER., (2003), vol. 5, no. 2, pages R91 - R96
    - CHEN, BLOOD, (20010701), vol. 98, no. 1, pages 156 - 64
    - KLEBANOFF ET AL., J IMMUNOTHER., (2012), vol. 35, no. 9, pages 651 - 660
    - LUPTON S. D. ET AL., MOL. AND CELL BIOL., (1991), vol. 11, page 6
    - RIDDELL ET AL., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1992), vol. 3, pages 319 - 338
    - SADELAIN ET AL., CANCER DISCOV., (201304), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 388 - 398
    - DAVILA ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2013), vol. 8, no. 4, page E61338
    - TURTLE ET AL., CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (201210), vol. 24, no. 5, pages 633 - 39
    - WU ET AL., CANCER, (201203), vol. 18, no. 2, pages 160 - 75
    - PARKHURST ET AL., CLIN CANCER RES., (2009), vol. 15, pages 169 - 180
    - COHEN ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 175, pages 5799 - 5808
    - VARELA-ROHENA ET AL., NATMED., (2008), vol. 14, pages 1390 - 1395
    - LI, NAT BIOTECHNOL., (2005), vol. 23, pages 349 - 354
    - BAUM ET AL., MOLECULAR THERAPY: THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF GENE THERAPY, (2006), vol. 13, pages 1050 - 1063
    - FRECHA ET AL., MOLECULAR THERAPY: THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF GENE THERAPY, (2010), vol. 18, pages 1748 - 1757
    - HACKETT ET AL., MOLECULAR THERAPY: THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF GENE THERAPY, (2010), vol. 18, pages 674 - 683
    - WIGLER ET AL., CELL, (1977), vol. II, page 223
    - MULLEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (1992), vol. 89, page 33
    - CARLENS ET AL., EXP HEMATOL, (2000), vol. 28, no. 10, pages 1137 - 46
    - ALONSO-CAMINO ET AL., MOL THER NUCL ACIDS, (2013), vol. 2, page E93
    - PARK ET AL., TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (201111), vol. 29, no. 11, pages 550 - 557
    - MILLER; ROSMAN, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1989), vol. 7, pages 980 - 990
    - MILLER, A. D., HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1990), vol. 1, pages 5 - 14
    - SCARPA ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1991), vol. 180, pages 849 - 852
    - BUMS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 8033 - 8037
    - BORIS-LAWRIE; TEMIN, CUR. OPIN. GENET. DEVELOP., (1993), vol. 3, pages 102 - 109
    - WANG ET AL., J. IMMUNOTHER., (2012), vol. 35, no. 9, pages 689 - 701
    - COOPER ET AL., BLOOD, (2003), vol. 101, pages 1637 - 1644
    - VERHOEYEN ET AL., METHODS MOL BIOL., (2009), vol. 506, pages 97 - 114
    - CAVALIERI ET AL., BLOOD, (2003), vol. 102, no. 2, pages 497 - 505
    - CHICAYBAM ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2013), vol. 8, no. 3, page E60298
    - VAN TEDELOO ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (2000), vol. 7, no. 16, pages 1431 - 1437
    - MANURI ET AL., HUM GENE THER, (2010), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 427 - 437
    - SHARMA ET AL., MOLEC THER NUCL ACIDS, (2013), vol. 2, page E74
    - HUANG ET AL., METHODS MOL BIOL, (2009), vol. 506, pages 115 - 126
    - ., Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS
    - JOHNSTON, NATURE, (1990), vol. 346, pages 776 - 777
    - BRASH ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (1987), vol. 7, pages 2031 - 2034
    - ROSENBERG SA ET AL., N ENGL JMED., (1988), vol. 319, pages 1676 - 1680
    - ROSENBERG, NAT REV CLIN ONCOL., (2011), vol. 8, no. 10, pages 577 - 85
    - THEMELI ET AL., NAT BIOTECHNOL., (2013), vol. 31, no. 10, pages 928 - 933
    - TSUKAHARA ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (2013), vol. 438, no. 1, pages 84 - 9
    - SZOKA ET AL., ANN. REV. BIOPHYS. BIOENG., (1980), vol. 9, page 467
    - KOCHENDERFER ET AL., J. IMMUNOTHERAPY, (2009), vol. 32, no. 7, pages 689 - 702
    - HERMAN ET AL., J. IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, (2004), vol. 285, no. 1, pages 25 - 40
    - WADWA ET AL., J. DRUG TARGETING, (1995), vol. 3, page 1 1 1
 WO1991US08442
 WO1994US05601