Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3137056

EP3137056 - BISMUTH-CONTAINING LIQUID PHARMACEUTICAL SUSPENSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.11.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.02.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  31.10.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
08.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2017/10]
Inventor(s)01 / WHITE, Daniel, Jerome, Jr.
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
02 / GODLEWSKI, Michael, Selden
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
03 / GULBIN, Timothy, Charles
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
04 / MYATT, Graham, John
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
 [2017/10]
Representative(s)P&G Patent Germany
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Straße 40
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/10]Sauvaître, Thibault Bruno
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Patent Department
PO Box 14
Frankfurter Straße 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date15721104.629.04.2015
[2017/10]
WO2015US28216
Priority number, dateUS201461985650P29.04.2014         Original published format: US 201461985650 P
[2017/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015168242
Date:05.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3137056
Date:08.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2015
[2017/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/08, A61K47/36, A61K31/29
[2017/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/10]
TitleGerman:WISMUTHALTIGE FLÜSSIGE PHARMAZEUTISCHE SUSPENSIONEN[2017/10]
English:BISMUTH-CONTAINING LIQUID PHARMACEUTICAL SUSPENSIONS[2017/10]
French:SUSPENSIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES CONTENANT DU BISMUTH[2017/10]
Entry into regional phase15.09.2016National basic fee paid 
15.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/10]
15.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
15.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO03066022  (PHARMACIA CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * example - *;
 [Y]WO0010527  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 1-12 * example 6 *;
 [Y]US5013560  (STENTZ LAURA L [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * example I *;
 [Y]EP1488812  (MEDRX CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * table 9 *;
 [A]FR2703250  (CHICOURI MARCEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * example - *