Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3137018

EP3137018 - CONVERTIBLE PRE-PARTIAL KNEE REPLACEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.09.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.02.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 08.05.2019  [2019/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
56 East Bell Drive
Warsaw, IN 46582 / US
[2017/10]
Inventor(s)01 / LLOYD, Russell
73 Sedgebrook
Liden
Swindon Wiltshire SN3 6EZ / GB
02 / MAY, Brian
218 E. Dellview Drive
Warsaw, Indiana 46582 / US
 [2017/10]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2017/10]
Application number, filing date15721477.627.04.2015
[2017/10]
WO2015US27717
Priority number, dateUS20141426313328.04.2014         Original published format: US201414263133
[2017/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015167985
Date:05.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3137018
Date:08.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2015
[2017/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3137018
Date:14.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/38
[2017/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/10]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:UMWANDELBARER PRÄPARTIALER KNIEERSATZ[2017/10]
English:CONVERTIBLE PRE-PARTIAL KNEE REPLACEMENT[2017/10]
French:PROTHÈSE DE GENOU PRÉ-PARTIELLE CONVERTIBLE[2017/10]
Entry into regional phase28.11.2016National basic fee paid 
28.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
28.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/10]
28.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2018Fee for grant paid
25.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)17.12.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL14.03.2018
AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
DK14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
MC14.03.2018
NL14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SI14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
SM14.03.2018
IE27.04.2018
LU27.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
PT16.07.2018
[2019/19]
Former [2019/12]AL14.03.2018
AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
DK14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
MC14.03.2018
NL14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SI14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
SM14.03.2018
LU27.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
PT16.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AL14.03.2018
AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
DK14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
MC14.03.2018
NL14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
SM14.03.2018
LU27.04.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
PT16.07.2018
Former [2019/06]AL14.03.2018
AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
MC14.03.2018
NL14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
SM14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
PT16.07.2018
Former [2019/03]AL14.03.2018
AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
NL14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
SM14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
PT16.07.2018
Former [2018/52]AL14.03.2018
AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
NL14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
SM14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
Former [2018/50]AL14.03.2018
AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
NL14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
Former [2018/49]AL14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
NL14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
Former [2018/47]AL14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
NL14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
Former [2018/46]AL14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
NL14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
Former [2018/45]CY14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
NL14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
Former [2018/40]CY14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
RS14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
Former [2018/37]CY14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
Former [2018/35]CY14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
NO14.06.2018
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2007100460  (RHODES JAMES M [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0071] * * figures 5,12,18-22,29-34 * [Y] 5;
 [XY]FR2851156  (HECHARD PATRICK [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,10,12,13 * page 5, line 2 - line 24 * * page 6, line 18 - line 30 * * page 8, line 5 - line 17 * * figures 1,2,6 * [Y] 16;
 [Y]US2009125115  (POPOOLA OLUDELE O [US], et al) [Y] 5,16 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * * figures 1-4,7-9,11 *;
 [A]US2012116524  (WALKER PETER STANLEY [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0060] * * figures 3-7 *