Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3137196

EP3137196 - ASYMMETRIC POLY(PHENYLENE ETHER) CO-POLYMER MEMBRANE, SEPARATION MODULE THEREOF; AND METHODS OF MAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.11.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.05.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.02.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2019  [2019/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
[N/P]
Former [2017/10]For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BERZINIS, Albin Peter
1 Noryl Avenue
Selkirk, New York 12158 / US
02 / HALBFINGER, Rachel Elizabeth
1 Noryl Avenue
Selkirk, New York 12158 / US
03 / BIKEL, Matias
Plasticslaan 1
NL-4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
04 / BAJAJ, Pooja
1 Noryl Avenue
Selkirk, New York 12158 / US
 [2017/10]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2017/10]
Application number, filing date15721524.501.05.2015
[2017/10]
WO2015US28842
Priority number, dateUS201461987168P01.05.2014         Original published format: US 201461987168 P
[2017/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015168592
Date:05.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3137196
Date:08.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2015
[2017/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.11.2015
ClassificationInternational:B01D67/00, B01D69/02, B01D71/52, B01D71/76
[2017/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/10]
TitleGerman:ASYMMETRISCHE POLY(PHENYLENETHER)-COPOLYMER-MEMBRAN, TRENNMODUL DAVON UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG[2017/10]
English:ASYMMETRIC POLY(PHENYLENE ETHER) CO-POLYMER MEMBRANE, SEPARATION MODULE THEREOF; AND METHODS OF MAKING[2017/10]
French:MEMBRANE DE COPOLYMÈRE DE POLY(PHÉNYLÈNE ÉTHER) ASYMÉTRIQUE, MODULE DE SÉPARATION ASSOCIÉ ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION[2017/10]
Entry into regional phase14.11.2016National basic fee paid 
14.11.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
14.11.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.11.2016Examination requested  [2017/10]
14.11.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
31.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/01]
28.08.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201804   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2008103599  (SABIC INNOVATIVE PLASTICS IP [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0111] , [0120]; examples 18,22; claim 24 * * the whole document * [I] 3,6-20;
 [I]US4944775  (HAYES RICHARD A [US]) [I] 1-20 * examples; column 2, lines 43-53; table 1 *